EP3954559 - HEAT PUMP SYSTEM FOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.08.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hyundai Motor Company 12, Heolleung-ro Seocho-gu Seoul / KR | For all designated states Kia Corporation 12, Heolleung-ro Seocho-gu Seoul 06797 / KR | [2022/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Jae Yeon 18280 Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
KIM, Yeonho 18280 Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
KIM, Jeawan 18280 Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
CHO, Wan Je 18280 Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2022/07] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2022/07] | Application number, filing date | 21161265.0 | 08.03.2021 | [2022/07] | Priority number, date | KR20200101744 | 13.08.2020 Original published format: KR 20200101744 | [2022/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3954559 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3954559 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/00, B60H1/32 | [2022/07] | CPC: |
B60H1/00278 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B60H1/00385 (CN,KR,US);
B60H1/00885 (EP,KR,US);
B60H1/00899 (CN);
B60H1/00921 (EP);
B60H1/143 (CN,KR,US);
B60H1/2218 (KR);
B60H1/2221 (KR);
B60H1/3213 (KR,US);
B60H1/32284 (EP,US);
B60H1/323 (KR);
F25B41/385 (KR);
B60H2001/00307 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/36] |
Former [2022/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | WÄRMEPUMPENSYSTEM FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG | [2022/07] | English: | HEAT PUMP SYSTEM FOR VEHICLE | [2022/07] | French: | SYSTÈME DE POMPE À CHALEUR POUR VÉHICULE | [2022/07] | Examination procedure | 29.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/36] | 29.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.10.2023 | CZ | 04.10.2023 | DK | 04.10.2023 | EE | 04.10.2023 | ES | 04.10.2023 | HR | 04.10.2023 | IT | 04.10.2023 | LT | 04.10.2023 | LV | 04.10.2023 | NL | 04.10.2023 | PL | 04.10.2023 | RO | 04.10.2023 | RS | 04.10.2023 | SE | 04.10.2023 | SK | 04.10.2023 | SM | 04.10.2023 | BG | 04.01.2024 | NO | 04.01.2024 | GR | 05.01.2024 | IS | 04.02.2024 | PT | 05.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
CZ | 04.10.2023 | ||
DK | 04.10.2023 | ||
EE | 04.10.2023 | ||
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RO | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
DK | 04.10.2023 | ||
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 04.10.2023 | |
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 04.10.2023 | |
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 04.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012225341 (MAJOR GREGORY [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * paragraphs [0012] - [0034]; figures 1-2; claims 1-5 *; | [A]US2018037086 (NICGORSKI DANA [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * paragraphs [0046] - [0065]; figure 1; claims 1-8 *; | [A]CN109532563 (JIANGSU MINAN AUTOMOTIVE CO LTD) [A] 1-17 * paragraphs [0037] - [0055]; figures 1-9; claims 1-8 *; | [A]WO2019225867 (HANON SYSTEMS [KR]) [A] 1-17* paragraphs [0034] - [0082]; figures 1-6; claims 1-7 * |