Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB202004382D0 | 13.05.2020 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB202004382 | 26.03.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB202004384D0 | 13.05.2020 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB202004384 | 26.03.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB202004385D0 | 13.05.2020 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB202004385 | 26.03.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB202004386D0 | 13.05.2020 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB202004386 | 26.03.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB202004387D0 | 13.05.2020 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB202004387 | 26.03.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021348555 | ![]() | 11.11.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB202004382 | 26.03.2020 | GB202004384 | 26.03.2020 | GB202004385 | 26.03.2020 | GB202004386 | 26.03.2020 | GB202004387 | 26.03.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021301764 | ![]() | 30.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB202004382 | 26.03.2020 | GB202004384 | 26.03.2020 | GB202004385 | 26.03.2020 | GB202004386 | 26.03.2020 | GB202004387 | 26.03.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021301763 | ![]() | 30.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB202004382 | 26.03.2020 | GB202004384 | 26.03.2020 | GB202004385 | 26.03.2020 | GB202004386 | 26.03.2020 | GB202004387 | 26.03.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11629668 | ![]() | 18.04.2023 | B2 | US2021301719 | 30.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB202004382 | 26.03.2020 | GB202004384 | 26.03.2020 | GB202004385 | 26.03.2020 | GB202004386 | 26.03.2020 | GB202004387 | 26.03.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11519363 | ![]() | 06.12.2022 | B2 | US2021301718 | 30.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB202004382 | 26.03.2020 | GB202004384 | 26.03.2020 | GB202004385 | 26.03.2020 | GB202004386 | 26.03.2020 | GB202004387 | 26.03.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3885556 | ![]() | 29.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB202004382 | 26.03.2020 | GB202004384 | 26.03.2020 | GB202004385 | 26.03.2020 | GB202004386 | 26.03.2020 | GB202004387 | 26.03.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3885555 | ![]() | 29.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB202004382 | 26.03.2020 | GB202004384 | 26.03.2020 | GB202004385 | 26.03.2020 | GB202004386 | 26.03.2020 | GB202004387 | 26.03.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3885554 | ![]() | 29.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB202004382 | 26.03.2020 | GB202004384 | 26.03.2020 | GB202004385 | 26.03.2020 | GB202004386 | 26.03.2020 | GB202004387 | 26.03.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3885553 | ![]() | 29.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB202004382 | 26.03.2020 | GB202004384 | 26.03.2020 | GB202004385 | 26.03.2020 | GB202004386 | 26.03.2020 | GB202004387 | 26.03.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113446118 | ![]() | 28.09.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | GB202004382 | 26.03.2020 | GB202004384 | 26.03.2020 | GB202004385 | 26.03.2020 | GB202004386 | 26.03.2020 | GB202004387 | 26.03.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113446117 | ![]() | 28.09.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | GB202004382 | 26.03.2020 | GB202004384 | 26.03.2020 | GB202004385 | 26.03.2020 | GB202004386 | 26.03.2020 | GB202004387 | 26.03.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113446116 | ![]() | 28.09.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | GB202004382 | 26.03.2020 | GB202004384 | 26.03.2020 | GB202004385 | 26.03.2020 | GB202004386 | 26.03.2020 | GB202004387 | 26.03.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113446115 | ![]() | 28.09.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | GB202004382 | 26.03.2020 | GB202004384 | 26.03.2020 | GB202004385 | 26.03.2020 | GB202004386 | 26.03.2020 | GB202004387 | 26.03.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113446114 | ![]() | 28.09.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | GB202004382 | 26.03.2020 | GB202004384 | 26.03.2020 | GB202004385 | 26.03.2020 | GB202004386 | 26.03.2020 | GB202004387 | 26.03.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3885552 | ![]() | 29.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB202004382 | 26.03.2020 | GB202004384 | 26.03.2020 | GB202004385 | 26.03.2020 | GB202004386 | 26.03.2020 | GB202004387 | 26.03.2020 |