EP3885555 - GAS TURBINE ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.12.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc Kings Place, 90 York Way London N1 9FX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/39] | For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc Kings Place 90 York Way London N1 9FX / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bousfield, Ian c/o Rolls-Royce plc PO Box 31 Derby, Derbyshire DE24 8BJ / GB | 02 /
Hales, Michael c/o Rolls-Royce plc PO Box 31 Derby, Derbyshire DE24 8BJ / GB | [2021/39] | Representative(s) | Rolls-Royce plc Moor Lane (ML-9) PO Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/39] | Rolls-Royce plc Intellectual Property Dept SinA-48 PO Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 21161765.9 | 10.03.2021 | [2021/39] | Priority number, date | GB20200004382 | 26.03.2020 Original published format: GB 202004382 | GB20200004387 | 26.03.2020 Original published format: GB 202004387 | GB20200004385 | 26.03.2020 Original published format: GB 202004385 | GB20200004384 | 26.03.2020 Original published format: GB 202004384 | GB20200004386 | 26.03.2020 Original published format: GB 202004386 | [2021/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3885555 | Date: | 29.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F02C3/107 | [2021/39] | CPC: |
F02C3/107 (EP,CN,US);
F02K3/06 (EP,CN,US);
F02C3/06 (US);
F02C7/36 (EP,US);
F02C9/24 (CN);
F02C9/18 (US);
F05D2220/3216 (US);
F05D2220/323 (US);
F05D2240/60 (US);
F05D2250/80 (EP);
F05D2260/4031 (EP);
F05D2260/40311 (US);
Y02T50/60 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/18] |
Former [2021/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GASTURBINENTRIEBWERK | [2021/39] | English: | GAS TURBINE ENGINE | [2021/39] | French: | MOTEUR DE TURBINE À GAZ | [2021/39] | Examination procedure | 28.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/18] | 28.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/34] | 24.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2018230912 (HASEL KARL L [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * figure 5 * * paragraph [0146] *; | [A]EP3444468 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [A] 1-11* paragraph [0025] *; | [A] - J Bijewitz, "Architectural comparison of advanced Ultra-High Bypass ratio turbofans for medium to long range application", (20141231), URL: http://www.dglr.de/publikationen/2015/340105.pdf, (20180316), XP055460144 [A] 1-11 * table 4 * * figure 4 * | [A] - Gerald Knip, "NASA Technical Memorandum 8%68 ' Analysis of an Advanced Technology Subsonic Turbofan Incorporating Revolutionary Materials", (19870501), URL: https://ntrs.nasa.gov/archive/nasa/casi.ntrs.nasa.gov/19870013247.pdf, (20170324), XP055358657 [A] 1-11 * figure 13 * |