Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
04.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.09.2023 [2023/36] |
09.05.2023 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
21.04.2023 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
12.08.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 14.09.2022 [2022/37] |
12.03.2021 | Change - representative |