EP4056280 - A DRIVE TRAIN ASSEMBLY FOR A ROLL CRUSHER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.08.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.09.2023 [2023/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sandvik SRP AB 233 81 Svedala / SE | [2022/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ueberberg, Rolf 233 81 Svedala / SE | 02 /
Bender, Maik 233 81 Svedala / SE | 03 /
Fischer, Udo 233 81 Svedala / SE | 04 /
Ring, Tobias 233 81 Svedala / SE | 05 /
Nussbaumer, Robert 233 81 Svedala / SE | [2022/37] | Representative(s) | Sandvik Sandvik Intellectual Property AB 811 81 Sandviken / SE | [2022/37] | Application number, filing date | 21162057.0 | 11.03.2021 | [2022/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4056280 | Date: | 14.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B02C4/02, B02C4/08, B02C4/32, B02C4/42 | [2022/37] | CPC: |
B02C4/02 (EP);
B02C4/08 (EP);
B02C4/32 (EP);
B02C4/42 (EP);
B02C4/423 (EP);
B02C4/426 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTRIEBSSTRANGANORDNUNG FÜR EINEN WALZENBRECHER | [2022/37] | English: | A DRIVE TRAIN ASSEMBLY FOR A ROLL CRUSHER | [2022/37] | French: | AGENCEMENT D'ENTRAÎNEMENT POUR UN BROYEUR ROTATIF | [2022/37] | Examination procedure | 15.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/36] | 20.04.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/36] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN101722079B (YAOLING QIAN) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [XA]US2012132739 (PUSHECK BERNARD [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,14,15 * paragraphs [0015] - [0026]; figures 1-6 * [A] 5,7-13; | [A]DE202016101205U (CRUSH + SIZE TECH GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1,14* paragraphs [0011] - [0018] - [0025] - [0035] - [0040] - [0051]; figures 1-8 * |