EP3885100 - TOOL FOR INJECTION MOULDING OF PLASTIC PARTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.03.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Braunform GmbH Unter Gereuth 7 + 14 79353 Bahlingen / DE | [2021/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEEBACHER, Georg Franz Ahornweg 6 79350 Sexau / DE | [2021/39] | Representative(s) | Kleine, Hubertus, et al Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [2021/39] | Application number, filing date | 21162118.0 | 11.03.2021 | [2021/39] | Priority number, date | DE202020101612U | 25.03.2020 Original published format: DE 202020101612 U | [2021/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3885100 | Date: | 29.09.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3885100 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/56, B29C45/26, B29C45/73, // B29C45/00 | [2023/35] | CPC: |
B29C45/2618 (EP);
B29C45/262 (EP);
B29C45/5675 (EP);
B29C45/7312 (EP);
B29C45/0081 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/39] | B29C45/56, // B29C45/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/17] |
Former [2021/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | WERKZEUG ZUM SPRITZGIESSEN VON KUNSTSTOFFTEILEN | [2021/39] | English: | TOOL FOR INJECTION MOULDING OF PLASTIC PARTS | [2021/39] | French: | OUTIL DE MOULAGE PAR INJECTION DE PIÈCES EN MATIÈRE PLASTIQUE | [2021/39] | Examination procedure | 23.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/17] | 23.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 17.01.2024 | ES | 17.01.2024 | FI | 17.01.2024 | HR | 17.01.2024 | LT | 17.01.2024 | LV | 17.01.2024 | NL | 17.01.2024 | PL | 17.01.2024 | SE | 17.01.2024 | NO | 17.04.2024 | RS | 17.04.2024 | GR | 18.04.2024 | IS | 17.05.2024 | PT | 17.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | BG | 17.01.2024 | |
ES | 17.01.2024 | ||
FI | 17.01.2024 | ||
HR | 17.01.2024 | ||
LT | 17.01.2024 | ||
LV | 17.01.2024 | ||
NL | 17.01.2024 | ||
PL | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
RS | 17.04.2024 | ||
GR | 18.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
PT | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 17.01.2024 | |
ES | 17.01.2024 | ||
FI | 17.01.2024 | ||
HR | 17.01.2024 | ||
LT | 17.01.2024 | ||
NL | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
RS | 17.04.2024 | ||
GR | 18.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 17.01.2024 | |
NL | 17.01.2024 | ||
NO | 17.04.2024 | ||
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | NL | 17.01.2024 | |
IS | 17.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/31] | NL | 17.01.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP0363948 (KLOECKNER FERROMATIK DESMA [DE]) [I] 1,12,13 * Anspruch 1; Fig. 1, 2 *; | [Y]DE4105687 (YOKOI HIDETOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1* Anspruch 1; Fig. 1, 3 *; | [I]JPH079482 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [I] 1,4,5,7,13-15 * Anspruch 7; Para. [0015, 0019, 0038]; Fig. 7, 8 *; | [IY]JP2001179780 (TOYO MACHINERY & METAL, et al) [I] 1,6,8-11,13-15 * Para. [0019]; Fig. 1 * [Y] 1; | [X]DE10234198 (TOYODA GOSEI KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,11,13 * Anspruch 2, 15; Para. [0040, 0053]; Fig. 4A, 4B, 5, 12A-12C *; | [I]DE10248975 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [I] 1,5,7,12,13 * Anspruch 10; Para. [0027, 0028]; Fig. 1-4 *; | [I]DE102004056451 (P21 POWER FOR THE 21ST CENTURY [DE]) [I] 1,3 * Anspruch 1, 8; Fig. 2, 3 * | Examination | DE102005058205 |