EP3879785 - SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING NETWORK ACCESS OF TERMINAL BASED ON TUNNEL AND METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.05.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.02.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PRIBIT Technology, Inc. 1303, 298, Beotkkot-ro Geumcheon-gu Seoul 08510 / KR | [2021/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Young Rang 1303, 298, Beotkkot-ro, Geumcheon-gu 08510 Seoul / KR | 02 /
LEE, Min Jae 1303, 298, Beotkkot-ro Geumcheon-gu 08510 Seoul / KR | 03 /
SONG, Pil Ho 1303, 298, Beotkkot-ro Geumcheon-gu 08510 Seoul / KR | 04 /
KIM, Joo Tae 1303, 298, Beotkkot-ro Geumcheon-gu 08510 Seoul / KR | [2021/37] | Representative(s) | RCD-Patent Giesen, Schmelcher & Griebel Patentwanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 3106 52118 Herzogenrath / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/37] | RCD Patent Giesen, Schmelcher & Griebel Patentwanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 3106 52118 Herzogenrath / DE | Application number, filing date | 21162189.1 | 12.03.2021 | [2021/37] | Priority number, date | KR20200030721 | 12.03.2020 Original published format: KR 20200030721 | [2021/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3879785 | Date: | 15.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2021/37] | CPC: |
H04L63/0227 (EP);
H04L63/029 (KR);
H04L12/4633 (KR);
H04L47/2483 (KR);
H04L47/32 (KR);
H04L63/0272 (EP,KR);
H04L63/08 (KR);
H04L63/101 (EP);
H04L63/123 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/13] |
Former [2021/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR STEUERUNG DES NETZWERKZUGRIFFS EINES ENDGERÄTES BASIEREND AUF EINEM TUNNEL UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2021/37] | English: | SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING NETWORK ACCESS OF TERMINAL BASED ON TUNNEL AND METHOD THEREOF | [2021/37] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CONTRÔLE D'ACCÈS AU RÉSEAU D'UN TERMINAL BASÉ SUR UN TUNNEL ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ | [2021/37] | Examination procedure | 22.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/13] | 22.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | EP22157923.8 / EP4020941 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2017063782 (JAIN JAYANT [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0082] * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0103] - paragraph [0105] *; | [A]EP3254415 (CRYPTZONE NORTH AMERICA INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0058] ** paragraph [0083] - paragraph [0086] *; | [I]US2019238592 (QURESHI WAHEED [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * paragraph [0170] - paragraph [0181] * * paragraph [0203] - paragraph [0205] * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0102] * * paragraph [0249] - paragraph [0252] *; | [E]WO2021060856 (PRIBIT TECH INC [KR]) [E] 1-15 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0133] - paragraph [0138] * * paragraph [0151] - paragraph [0156] * |