Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP4056285 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN202280027314 EP2022056367W EP21162411 JP2023555631 KR20237034582 US202218550148



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2024247009Global Dossier 25.07.2024A1
Priority number Date
WO2022EP56367 11.03.2022
EP21162411 12.03.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20230156930Global Dossier 15.11.2023A
Priority number Date
WO2022EP56367 11.03.2022
EP21162411 12.03.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2024510987Global Dossier 12.03.2024A
Priority number Date
WO2022EP56367 11.03.2022
EP21162411 12.03.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN117136106Global Dossier 28.11.2023A
Priority number Date
WO2022EP56367 11.03.2022
EP21162411 12.03.2021
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2022189646Global Dossier 15.09.2022A1
Priority number Date
EP21162411 12.03.2021
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP4056285Global Dossier 14.09.2022A1
Priority number Date
EP21162411 12.03.2021
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TW202248204 16.12.2022A
Priority number Date
EP21162411 12.03.2021