EP3879186 - ION BOILER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.02.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ruptura 687 Chemin Coteaux des Oiseaux 13680 Lancon / FR | [2021/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LE HELLEY, Pierrick, Marc 914 Chemin du Puits de l'Olivier 13680 LANCON / FR | 02 /
BIONDO, Stéphane Résidence Valriant 2, Bâtiment D2, Route Nationale 8 13409 AUBAGNE / FR | [2021/37] | Representative(s) | IPAZ Bâtiment Platon Parc Les Algorithmes 91190 Saint-Aubin / FR | [2024/09] |
Former [2021/37] | IPAZ Parc Les Algorithmes, Bâtiment Platon CS 70003 Saint-Aubin 91192 Gif-sur-Yvette Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 21162432.5 | 12.03.2021 | [2021/37] | Priority number, date | FR20200002507 | 13.03.2020 Original published format: FR 2002507 | [2021/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3879186 | Date: | 15.09.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3879186 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F24D3/08, F24D19/10, F24H1/10, H05B1/02, H05B3/60, // F24H9/14 | [2021/37] | CPC: |
F24H1/106 (EP);
F24D19/1066 (EP,US);
F24D3/08 (EP);
H05B1/0283 (EP);
H05B3/60 (EP);
F24H15/128 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/10] |
Former [2021/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | IONEN-HEIZKESSEL | [2021/37] | English: | ION BOILER | [2021/37] | French: | CHAUDIERE IONIQUE | [2021/37] | Examination procedure | 02.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/10] | 02.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 28.02.2024 | HR | 28.02.2024 | PL | 28.02.2024 | NO | 28.05.2024 | RS | 28.05.2024 | GR | 29.05.2024 | IS | 28.06.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | ES | 28.02.2024 | |
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | NO | 28.05.2024 | |
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 28.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB647631 (JOHN ARTHUR TATEM, et al) [Y] 8,9* the whole document *; | [XYI]DE3421807 (CKD DUKLA [CS]) [X] 1 * page 8, line 3 - page 10, line 13; figures 1,2,3 * [Y] 8,9 [I] 3,4; | [XYI]WO2007062432 (MARKOVIC MIROSLAV [YU]) [X] 1,2,5 * page 3, paragraph 1 - page 4, paragraph 8; figures 1-6 * [Y] 8,9 [I] 3,4,6,7; | [XI]EP3333500 (LC INNOVATION S R L [IT]) [X] 1,2,5 * column 2, paragraph 17 - column 5, paragraph 41; figures 1-3 * [I] 3,4,8-15 |