EP3854371 - VIAL STABILIZER BASE WITH CONNECTABLE VIAL ADAPTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.10.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Becton Dickinson and Company Limited Pottery Road Kill O'The Grange Dun Laoghaire / IE | [2021/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marici, Paul Paia 38 Hedgerow Street Piscataway, NJ New Jersey 08854 / US | 02 /
Yemane-Tekeste, Girum 240 Prospect Avenue, Apt. 404 Hackensack, NJ New Jersey 07601 / US | [2021/30] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2021/30] | Application number, filing date | 21162483.8 | 21.04.2015 | [2021/30] | Priority number, date | US201461982054P | 21.04.2014 Original published format: US 201461982054 P | [2021/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3854371 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61J1/16, A61J1/20 | [2021/30] | CPC: |
A61J1/16 (EP,CN,IL,US);
A61J1/2055 (EP,CN,IL,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] |
Former [2021/30] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | PHIOLENSTABILISATORSOCKEL MIT VERBINDBAREM PHIOLENADAPTER | [2021/30] | English: | VIAL STABILIZER BASE WITH CONNECTABLE VIAL ADAPTER | [2021/30] | French: | BASE STABILISATRICE DE FLACON AYANT UN ADAPTATEUR DE FLACON | [2021/30] | Examination procedure | 30.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 30.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15721423.0 / EP3134054 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006108319 (MEITTUNEN ERIC J [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2007108205 (PORRAS JOSE A [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0044] , [0045]; figure 10 *; | [A]US2012046635 (HEDGEPETH BRUCE [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]WO2014008397 (BIOGEN IDEC INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0075] - [0078] - [0088]; figures 4,5,10 * |