EP3886250 - MULTI-BAND ANTENNAS HAVING ENHANCED DIRECTORS THEREIN THAT INHIBIT RADIATION INTERFERENCE ACROSS MULTIPLE FREQUENCY BANDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CommScope Technologies LLC 1100 CommScope Place SE Hickory, NC 28602 / US | [2021/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Changfu 68 Su Hong Xi Lu Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215021 / CN | 02 /
WU, Runmiao 68 Su Hong Xi Lu Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215021 / CN | [2021/39] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [2023/34] |
Former [2021/39] | Parker, Andrew James Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21162590.0 | 15.03.2021 | [2021/39] | Priority number, date | CN202010212479 | 24.03.2020 Original published format: CN202010212479 | US202117181443 | 22.02.2021 Original published format: US202117181443 | [2021/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3886250 | Date: | 29.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3886250 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/24, H01Q5/49, H01Q25/00, H01Q21/06, H01Q21/28, H01Q15/00, H01Q19/24 | [2021/39] | CPC: |
H01Q1/246 (EP);
H01Q5/392 (US);
H01Q1/523 (US);
H01Q15/0013 (EP);
H01Q19/24 (EP);
H01Q21/062 (EP);
H01Q21/28 (EP);
H01Q25/001 (EP);
H01Q5/335 (US);
H01Q5/42 (US);
H01Q5/49 (EP);
H01Q5/50 (US);
H01Q9/0407 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/39] | Title | German: | MEHRBANDANTENNEN MIT VERBESSERTEN DIREKTOREN DARIN, DIE STRAHLUNGSINTERFERENZEN ÜBER MEHRERE FREQUENZBÄNDER VERHINDERN | [2021/39] | English: | MULTI-BAND ANTENNAS HAVING ENHANCED DIRECTORS THEREIN THAT INHIBIT RADIATION INTERFERENCE ACROSS MULTIPLE FREQUENCY BANDS | [2021/39] | French: | ANTENNES MULTIBANDE PRÉSENTANT DES DIRECTEURS AMÉLIORÉS QUI INHIBENT L'INTERFÉRENCE DE RAYONNEMENT À TRAVERS DE MULTIPLES BANDES DE FRÉQUENCE | [2021/39] | Examination procedure | 15.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/39] | 29.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.08.2023 | CZ | 23.08.2023 | DK | 23.08.2023 | EE | 23.08.2023 | ES | 23.08.2023 | FI | 23.08.2023 | HR | 23.08.2023 | IT | 23.08.2023 | LT | 23.08.2023 | LV | 23.08.2023 | NL | 23.08.2023 | PL | 23.08.2023 | RO | 23.08.2023 | RS | 23.08.2023 | SE | 23.08.2023 | SI | 23.08.2023 | SK | 23.08.2023 | SM | 23.08.2023 | NO | 23.11.2023 | GR | 24.11.2023 | IS | 23.12.2023 | PT | 26.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/27] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
CZ | 23.08.2023 | ||
DK | 23.08.2023 | ||
EE | 23.08.2023 | ||
ES | 23.08.2023 | ||
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
IT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SK | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
CZ | 23.08.2023 | ||
DK | 23.08.2023 | ||
EE | 23.08.2023 | ||
ES | 23.08.2023 | ||
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SK | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
CZ | 23.08.2023 | ||
DK | 23.08.2023 | ||
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 23.08.2023 | |
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2013104108 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN], et al) [X] 1-4,7,14 * page 2 - page 5; figure 1 * [I] 6,8-12; | [XI]US8994602 (PLET JÉRÔME [FR], et al) [X] 1-5,7,14,15 * column 4 - column 6; figure 8 * [I] 6,8-13; | [X]KR101829816B (INDUSTRY ACADEMIC COOPERATION FOUNDATION DAEGU UNIV [KR]) [X] 1-3,5-7,14,15 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0085]; figures 1,6 *; | [A]EP3614491 (COMMSCOPE TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US]) [A] 8-13* paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0033]; figures 2-4 * |