EP4059539 - METHOD OF PRODUCING A DRUG DELIVERY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.08.2023 [2023/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sensile Medical AG Solothurnerstrasse 235 4600 Olten / CH | [2022/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BÜRLI, Fabian 4600 Olten / CH | [2022/38] | Representative(s) | reuteler & cie SA Chemin de la Vuarpillière 29 1260 Nyon / CH | [2022/38] | Application number, filing date | 21162681.7 | 15.03.2021 | [2022/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4059539 | Date: | 21.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/145, A61M5/142, A61M5/42, // A61M5/24 | [2022/38] | CPC: |
A61M5/14248 (EP,US);
A61M5/14526 (EP,US);
A61M5/2466 (US);
A61M2005/14256 (EP);
A61M2005/14268 (EP);
A61M2005/2474 (EP);
A61M2205/07 (EP,US);
A61M2205/13 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3306 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3331 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3561 (EP);
A61M2205/502 (EP);
A61M2205/581 (EP);
A61M2205/583 (EP);
A61M2205/587 (EP);
A61M2207/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER ARZNEIMITTELABGABEVORRICHTUNG | [2022/38] | English: | METHOD OF PRODUCING A DRUG DELIVERY DEVICE | [2022/38] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN DISPOSITIF D'ADMINISTRATION DE MÉDICAMENTS | [2022/38] | Examination procedure | 22.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/35] | 13.04.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/35] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2013006213 (ARNITZ THEO [DE], et al); | [XI]WO2019038751 (STEADYMED LTD [IL]); | [I]US2019274924 (BARMAIMON EYAL [IL], et al); | [I]US2019275236 (BARMAIMON EYAL [IL], et al); | [I]US2021069410 (DESTEFANO MARK A [US], et al) | by applicant | WO2007074363 | WO2015015379 | WO2020109409 |