EP3907666 - METHOD, APPARATUS, ELECTRONIC DEVICE, READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM AND PROGRAM FOR CONSTRUCTING KEY-POINT LEARNING MODEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BEIJING BAIDU NETCOM SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CO. LTD. 2/F Baidu Campus, No. 10, Shangdi 10th Haidian District 100085 Beijing / CN | [2021/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MENG, Qingyue Haidian District, Beijing 100085 / CN | 02 /
ZHAO, Chen Haidian District, Beijing 100085 / CN | [2021/45] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2021/45] | Application number, filing date | 21162981.1 | 16.03.2021 | [2021/45] | Priority number, date | CN202010681773 | 15.07.2020 Original published format: CN202010681773 | [2021/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3907666 | Date: | 10.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3907666 | Date: | 30.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06N3/04, G06N3/08, G06K9/62, G06V40/10, G06V40/20, G06V10/46 | [2022/13] | CPC: |
G06N3/088 (EP,KR,US);
G06V10/764 (KR);
G06V40/20 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06F18/2155 (EP,US);
G06F18/2415 (EP,CN);
G06N3/045 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06N3/047 (EP);
G06N3/08 (CN);
G06V10/44 (CN,KR);
G06V10/462 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06V10/82 (KR);
G06V40/10 (EP,US);
G06N3/044 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/45] | G06N3/04, G06N3/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, GERÄT, ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG, LESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM UND PROGRAMM ZUR KONSTRUKTION EINES SCHLÜSSELPUNKTLERNMODELLS | [2021/45] | English: | METHOD, APPARATUS, ELECTRONIC DEVICE, READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM AND PROGRAM FOR CONSTRUCTING KEY-POINT LEARNING MODEL | [2021/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL, DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE, SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT LISIBLE ET PROGRAMME POUR LA CONSTRUCTION D'UN MODÈLE D'APPRENTISSAGE À POINTS CLÉS | [2021/45] | Examination procedure | 16.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/45] | 28.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - NORIMICHI UKITA ET AL, "Semi- and Weakly-supervised Human Pose Estimation", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20190604), XP081372848 [I] 1-11 * sections 2, 4 and 8 * * figure 1 * | [A] - BEM RODRIGO DE ET AL, A Semi-supervised Deep Generative Model for Human Body Analysis, ADVANCES IN DATABASES AND INFORMATION SYSTEMS; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE; LECT.NOTES COMPUTER], SPRINGER INTERNATIONAL PUBLISHING, CHAM, PAGE(S) 500 - 517, (20190129), ISBN 978-3-319-10403-4, XP047501692 [A] 1-11 * figure 2 * * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-030-11012-3_38 | [A] - MIN CONGWEN ET AL, "Conditional Generative Adversarial Network on Semi-supervised Learning Task", 2019 IEEE 5TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER AND COMMUNICATIONS (ICCC), IEEE, (20191206), doi:10.1109/ICCC47050.2019.9064268, pages 1448 - 1452, XP033754867 [A] 1-11 * section III * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICCC47050.2019.9064268 | [A] - GUO HENG ET AL, "Semi-Supervised Learning with Flexible Discriminator Objective in Generative Adversarial Networks Framework", 2018 37TH CHINESE CONTROL CONFERENCE (CCC), TECHNICAL COMMITTEE ON CONTROL THEORY, CHINESE ASSOCIATION OF AUTOMATION, (20180725), doi:10.23919/CHICC.2018.8483921, pages 9238 - 9243, XP033415078 [A] 1-11 * section 3.2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.23919/ChiCC.2018.8483921 |