EP4059396 - CLEANING HEAD FOR A WET VACUUM CLEANER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.08.2023 [2023/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2022/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
de Wit, Bastiaan Johannes 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Kahya, Orhan 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2022/38] | Representative(s) | Vollering, Stefanus Franciscus Maria Philips Domestic Appliances IP Department High Tech Campus 42 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2022/38] | de Vries, Janna, et al Philips Domestic Appliances Nederland B.V. High Tech Campus 42 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 21163069.4 | 17.03.2021 | [2022/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4059396 | Date: | 21.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A47L/ | [2022/38] | CPC: |
A47L11/4036 (EP,KR);
A47L11/302 (EP,KR,US);
A46B13/001 (US);
A46B13/02 (US);
A47L11/4041 (EP,KR,US);
A47L11/4069 (KR,US);
A47L11/4072 (EP,KR,US);
A47L11/408 (EP);
A47L11/4083 (US);
A47L11/4088 (KR,US);
A47L9/04 (EP);
A47L9/0477 (EP);
A46B2200/3033 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REINIGUNGSKOPF FÜR EINEN NASSSTAUBSAUGER | [2022/38] | English: | CLEANING HEAD FOR A WET VACUUM CLEANER | [2022/38] | French: | TÊTE DE NETTOYAGE POUR ASPIRATEUR HUMIDE | [2022/38] | Examination procedure | 22.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/35] | 13.04.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/35] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2436296 (VORWERK CO INTERHOLDING [DE]); | [X]EP2805659 (BISSELL HOMECARE INC [US]); | [A]US2015020346 (VAIL KEVIN [US], et al); | [A]EP3545809 (SCARSELLI PATRIZIA [IT], et al) |