EP3858926 - CURABLE COMPOSITION FOR INKJET, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING ELECTRONIC COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.06.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.02.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 4-4, Nishitemma 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8565 / JP | [2021/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANIKAWA, Mitsuru SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO. LTD 2-1 Hyakuyama Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun Osaka, 618-0021 / JP | 02 /
TAKAHASHI, Ryosuke SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO. LTD 2-1 Hyakuyama Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun Osaka, 618-0021 / JP | 03 /
INOUE, Takanori SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO. LTD 2-1 Hyakuyama Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun Osaka, 618-0021 / JP | 04 /
UEDA, Michihisa SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO. LTD 2-1 Hyakuyama Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun Osaka, 618-0021 / JP | 05 /
YAMADA, Tasuku SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO. LTD 2-1 Hyakuyama Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun Osaka, 618-0021 / JP | 06 /
FUJITA, Yoshito SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO. LTD 2-1 Hyakuyama Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun Osaka, 618-0021 / JP | 07 /
WATANABE, Takashi SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO. LTD 2-1 Hyakuyama Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun Osaka, 618-0021 / JP | 08 /
FUJITA, YUSUKE SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO. LTD 2-1 Hyakuyama Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun Osaka, 618-0021 / JP | [2021/31] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2021/31] | Application number, filing date | 21163133.8 | 12.02.2016 | [2021/31] | Priority number, date | JP20150025587 | 12.02.2015 Original published format: JP 2015025587 | JP20150055074 | 18.03.2015 Original published format: JP 2015055074 | JP20160001206 | 06.01.2016 Original published format: JP 2016001206 | [2021/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3858926 | Date: | 04.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/30, B41M5/00, H05K3/28, C09D11/101, C09D11/36, C09D11/38, C07D231/12, C07D249/04, C07D249/08, // H05K1/03 | [2021/31] | CPC: |
C09D11/101 (EP,US);
C09D11/38 (EP,KR,US);
C07C211/51 (US);
B41M5/0047 (KR);
C07D231/12 (EP,US);
C07D249/04 (EP,US);
C07D249/08 (EP,US);
C09D11/32 (KR);
C09D11/36 (EP,US);
H05K3/28 (KR);
H05K3/287 (EP,US);
H05K1/0346 (EP,US);
H05K2203/013 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/10] |
Former [2021/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | HÄRTBARE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR TINTENSTRAHL SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER ELEKTRONISCHEN KOMPONENTE | [2021/31] | English: | CURABLE COMPOSITION FOR INKJET, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING ELECTRONIC COMPONENT | [2021/31] | French: | COMPOSITION DURCISSABLE POUR JET D'ENCRE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN COMPOSANT ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2021/31] | Examination procedure | 02.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/10] | 02.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16749313.9 / EP3214142 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2010037456 (KYOCERA CHEM CORP) [X] 1-5,8,10,11 * examples 4, 5 *; | [A]WO2014050688 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [AP]EP2902455 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [AP] 1-11 * paragraphs [0011] , [0 54] , [0055] , [0098] , [0099] * * claims 1, 2 ** examples *; | [E]EP3249024 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-5,8-11 * examples;; tables 2-4 * * claims 1,4,11,15,16 * * paragraph [0152] * | by applicant | JP3074086B | WO2004099272 |