EP3855290 - REMOTE RENDERING FOR VIRTUAL IMAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.05.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2021/45] |
Former [2021/30] | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AMBRUS, Anthony Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000) One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
KROYMANN, Dan Microsoft Technology Licensing Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000) One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA Washington 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
EGBERT, Cameron Quinn Microsoft Technology Licensing Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000) One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA Washington 98052-6399 / US | 04 /
MCGLYNN, Jeffrey Wallace Microsoft Technology Licensing Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000) One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA Washington 98052-6399 / US | 05 /
EY, Michael Microsoft Technology Licensing Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000) One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2021/30] | Representative(s) | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [2021/30] | Application number, filing date | 21163413.4 | 19.10.2016 | [2021/30] | Priority number, date | US201514923082 | 26.10.2015 Original published format: US201514923082 | [2021/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3855290 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/01, G06T19/00 | [2021/30] | CPC: |
G06F3/011 (EP,US);
G02B27/0172 (US);
G06F3/012 (US);
G06T11/60 (US);
G06T15/005 (US);
G06T19/006 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/30] | Title | German: | FERNWIEDERGABE FÜR VRITUELLE BILDER | [2021/30] | English: | REMOTE RENDERING FOR VIRTUAL IMAGES | [2021/30] | French: | RENDU À DISTANCE POUR IMAGES VIRTUELLES | [2021/30] | Examination procedure | 18.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/30] | 28.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16790809.4 / EP3368965 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2011263332 (MIZRACHI YOSEF [IL]) [Y] 1-5,10-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0389] - paragraph [0393] * * figure 2A * [A] 6,7; | [YA]US2014267420 (SCHOWENGERDT BRIAN T [US], et al) [Y] 1-5,8-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0089] * * paragraph [0114] * * paragraph [0119] * * paragraph [0129] - paragraph [0146] * * paragraph [0164] * * paragraph [0255] * * figure 38 * [A] 6,7; | [Y]US2015002542 (CHAN CALVIN [US], et al) [Y] 8,9 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0086] * * paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0092] ** figures 1,2A,2B,3A,4A,4B,6A,6B * |