EP3882319 - AQUEOUS INK, INK CARTRIDGE AND INK JET RECORDING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.04.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2 SHIMOMARUKO 3-CHOME OHTA-KU Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2021/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAYASHI, Katsuhiro CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo, 146-8501 / JP | 02 /
FURUSE, Tsuyoshi CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo, 146-8501 / JP | 03 /
MIYABE, Masahito CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo, 146-8501 / JP | [2021/38] | Representative(s) | WESER & Kollegen Patentanwälte PartmbB Radeckestraße 43 81245 München / DE | [2021/38] | Application number, filing date | 21163422.5 | 18.03.2021 | [2021/38] | Priority number, date | JP20200049698 | 19.03.2020 Original published format: JP 2020049698 | JP20200049697 | 19.03.2020 Original published format: JP 2020049697 | JP20200049699 | 19.03.2020 Original published format: JP 2020049699 | JP20210023121 | 17.02.2021 Original published format: JP 2021023121 | [2021/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3882319 | Date: | 22.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3882319 | Date: | 06.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/104, C09D11/30, // C09D11/322 | [2021/38] | CPC: |
C09D11/322 (EP);
C09D11/033 (US);
B41J2/17503 (US);
C09D11/037 (US);
C09D11/104 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] |
Former [2021/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄSSRIGE TINTE, TINTENPATRONE UND TINTENSTRAHLAUFZEICHNUNGSVERFAHREN | [2021/38] | English: | AQUEOUS INK, INK CARTRIDGE AND INK JET RECORDING METHOD | [2021/38] | French: | ENCRE AQUEUSE, CARTOUCHE D'ENCRE ET PROCÉDÉ D'ENREGISTREMENT À JET D'ENCRE | [2021/38] | Examination procedure | 14.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/18] | 30.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2018282564 (MATSUZAKI AKIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0019] , [0020]; claims 1,6,7 *; | [A]US2016340530 (HORIUCHI TAKAYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2018150518 (CANON KK) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2018150413 (CANON KK) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US2016215157 (KAKIKAWA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | by applicant | JP2014088552 | JPH08269310 |