EP4060386 - TRIM PART FOR A TIMEPIECE OR JEWELLERY ITEM COMPRISING AN INTERFERENTIAL COLOUR COATING AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAID PART [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.03.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | 30.08.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Omega SA Jakob-Stämpfli-Strasse 96 2502 Bienne / CH | [2022/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARBOS, Corina 2300 La Chaux-de-Fonds / CH | 02 /
JEANRENAUD, Frédéric 2300 La Chaux-de-Fonds / CH | 03 /
KISSLING, Gregory 2520 La Neuveville / CH | [2022/38] | Representative(s) | ICB SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital, 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [2022/38] | Application number, filing date | 21163489.4 | 18.03.2021 | [2022/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4060386 | Date: | 21.09.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/00, G04B19/12, G04B37/22, G04B45/00 | [2022/38] | CPC: |
G04B19/12 (EP,US);
A44C27/006 (CN,KR,US);
A44C27/00 (CN);
G02B5/285 (US);
A44C27/002 (KR);
A44C27/005 (CN);
A44C27/007 (CN,US);
C23C14/08 (US);
C23C14/10 (US);
C23C14/14 (US);
C23C28/32 (US);
C23C28/3455 (US);
G02B5/286 (EP);
G04B37/22 (EP,US);
G04B45/0015 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/17] |
Former [2022/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERKLEIDUNGSTEIL EINER UHR ODER EINES SCHMUCKSTÜCKS MIT EINER INTERFERENZFARBBESCHICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DIESES TEILS | [2022/38] | English: | TRIM PART FOR A TIMEPIECE OR JEWELLERY ITEM COMPRISING AN INTERFERENTIAL COLOUR COATING AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAID PART | [2022/38] | French: | PIÈCE D'HABILLAGE D'HORLOGERIE OU DE BIJOUTERIE COMPRENANT UN REVÊTEMENT DE COULEUR INTERFÉRENTIELLE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE LADITE PIÈCE | [2022/38] | Examination procedure | 24.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/17] | 21.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US6849343 (PHILLIPS ROGER W [US], et al); | [A]US2010209698 (KORNHERR ANDREAS [AT], et al); | [IA]EP3339983 (SWATCH GROUP RES & DEV LTD [CH]) |