EP3936667 - BARRIER SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING THE PASSAGE OF VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK, SM | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Federal Signal Vama, S.A.U. Dr. Ferran, 7 08339 Vilassar de Dalt (Barcelona) / ES | [2022/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUÑÓZ GARCÍA, Juan José 08339 Vilassar de Dalt (Barcelona) / ES | [2023/46] |
Former [2022/02] | 01 /
MUÑÓZ GARCÍA, Juan José 08339 Vilassar De Dalt (Barcelona) / ES | Representative(s) | Ungria López, Javier Avda. Ramón y Cajal, 78 28043 Madrid / ES | [2022/02] | Application number, filing date | 21163920.8 | 22.03.2021 | [2022/02] | Priority number, date | ES20200031504U | 09.07.2020 Original published format: ES 202031504 U | [2022/02] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3936667 | Date: | 12.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3936667 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | E01F13/12 | [2022/02] | CPC: |
E01F13/123 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/26] |
Former [2022/02] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BARRIERESYSTEM ZUR KONTROLLE DER DURCHFAHRT VON FAHRZEUGEN | [2023/26] | English: | BARRIER SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING THE PASSAGE OF VEHICLES | [2022/02] | French: | SYSTÈME DE BARRIÈRE POUR CONTRÔLER LE PASSAGE DES VÉHICULES | [2022/02] |
Former [2022/02] | SCHRANKENSYSTEM ZUR KONTROLLE DER DURCHFAHRT VON FAHRZEUGEN | Examination procedure | 24.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/26] | 24.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 03.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.11.2023 | DK | 15.11.2023 | HR | 15.11.2023 | LT | 15.11.2023 | LV | 15.11.2023 | NL | 15.11.2023 | PL | 15.11.2023 | RS | 15.11.2023 | SE | 15.11.2023 | SM | 15.11.2023 | BG | 15.02.2024 | NO | 15.02.2024 | GR | 16.02.2024 | IS | 15.03.2024 | PT | 15.03.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/27] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 15.11.2023 | |
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 16.02.2024 | |
IS | 15.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9119856 (IDEPOTENTIAL AB [SE]) [A] 1-4 * page 2, line 25 - page 3, line 3; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US6474903 (MARTS DONNA J [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]US2004190990 (BLAIR WILLIAM H [US]) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [XDI]ES1202111U (FED SIGNAL VAMA SAU [ES]) [XD] 1 * the whole document * [I] 2,3 | by applicant | ES1202111U |