Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024011128 | Global Dossier | 11.01.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2022EP57026 | 17.03.2022 | EP21164031 | 22.03.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20230159534 | Global Dossier | 21.11.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2022EP57026 | 17.03.2022 | EP21164031 | 22.03.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2024514238 | Global Dossier | 29.03.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2022EP57026 | 17.03.2022 | EP21164031 | 22.03.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4313444 | Global Dossier | 07.02.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2022EP57026 | 17.03.2022 | EP21164031 | 22.03.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN117062682 | Global Dossier | 14.11.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2022EP57026 | 17.03.2022 | EP21164031 | 22.03.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2022200175 | Global Dossier | 29.09.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP21164031 | 22.03.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4063045 | Global Dossier | 28.09.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP21164031 | 22.03.2021 |