EP3826266 - METHOD FOR SENDING A CERTIFICATE, METHOD FOR RECEIVING A CERTIFICATE, CLOUD AND TERMINAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.12.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, SI | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BEIJING BAIDU NETCOM SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD. 2/F Baidu Campus No.10 Shangdi 10th Street Haidian District 100085 Beijing / CN | [2023/17] |
Former [2021/21] | For all designated states BEIJING BAIDU NETCOM SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CO. LTD. 2/F Baidu Campus, No. 10, Shangdi 10th Haidian District 100085 Beijing / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHAO, Xin 2/F Baidu Campus, No. 10, Shangdi 10th Street Haidian District Beijing, 100085 / CN | 02 /
LU, Danfeng 2/F Baidu Campus, No. 10, Shangdi 10th Street Haidian District Beijing, 100085 / CN | 03 /
CHEN, Sheng 2/F Baidu Campus, No. 10, Shangdi 10th Street Haidian District Beijing, 100085 / CN | 04 /
XIE, Jingru 2/F Baidu Campus, No. 10, Shangdi 10th Street Haidian District Beijing, 100085 / CN | [2021/21] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2021/21] | Application number, filing date | 21164216.0 | 23.03.2021 | [2021/21] | Priority number, date | CN20201161776 | 30.09.2020 Original published format: CN202011061776 | [2021/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3826266 | Date: | 26.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3826266 | Date: | 29.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3826266 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/32, G06F21/33, H04L9/40, H04L67/10 | [2022/52] | CPC: |
H04L63/062 (EP);
H04L63/0823 (EP,KR);
H04L9/3268 (EP,CN,US);
G06F21/33 (EP,KR);
H04L67/10 (EP,CN);
H04L9/3263 (KR);
H04L9/3265 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/39] | H04L29/06, H04L29/08, H04L9/32, G06F21/33 | ||
Former IPC [2021/21] | H04L29/06, H04L29/08, H04L9/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/21] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM SENDEN EINES ZERTIFIKATS, VERFAHREN ZUM EMPFANGEN EINES ZERTIFIKATS, CLOUD UND ENGERÄT | [2022/52] | English: | METHOD FOR SENDING A CERTIFICATE, METHOD FOR RECEIVING A CERTIFICATE, CLOUD AND TERMINAL DEVICE | [2021/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ENVOI D'UN CERTIFICAT, PROCÉDÉ DE RÉCEPTION D'UN CERTIFICAT, CLOUD ET DISPOSITIF TERMINAL | [2022/52] |
Former [2021/21] | VERFAHREN ZUM SENDEN EINES ZERTIFIKATS, VERFAHREN ZUM EMPFANGEN EINES ZERTIFIKATS, CLOUD UND ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2021/21] | PROCÉDÉ D'ENVOI DE CERTIFICAT, PROCÉDÉ DE RÉCEPTION DE CERTIFICAT, NUAGE ET DISPOSITIF TERMINAL | Examination procedure | 23.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/21] | 29.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.05.2023 | CZ | 03.05.2023 | DK | 03.05.2023 | EE | 03.05.2023 | ES | 03.05.2023 | FI | 03.05.2023 | HR | 03.05.2023 | IT | 03.05.2023 | LT | 03.05.2023 | LV | 03.05.2023 | NL | 03.05.2023 | PL | 03.05.2023 | RO | 03.05.2023 | RS | 03.05.2023 | SE | 03.05.2023 | SI | 03.05.2023 | SK | 03.05.2023 | SM | 03.05.2023 | NO | 03.08.2023 | GR | 04.08.2023 | IS | 03.09.2023 | PT | 04.09.2023 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/10] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
CZ | 03.05.2023 | ||
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 03.05.2023 | |
PT | 04.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2020259668 (LORESKAR CHRIS [GB], et al) [X] 1,5,7,10,12-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0079] * * figures 2-5 *[I] 2-4,6,8,9,11 | Examination | US2019074980 |