EP3825714 - VEHICLE INFRASTRUCTURE COOPERATIVE POSITIONING METHOD AND APPARATUS, ELECTRONIC DEVICE, AND AUTONOMOUS VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 11.10.2023 [2023/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apollo Intelligent Connectivity (Beijing) Technology Co., Ltd. 101, 1st floor, building 1, yard 7 Ruihe West 2nd Road Beijing Economic and Technological Development Zone Beijing 100176 / CN | [2021/48] |
Former [2021/21] | For all designated states BEIJING BAIDU NETCOM SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY CO. LTD. 2/F Baidu Campus, No. 10, Shangdi 10th Haidian District 100085 Beijing / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Kun 2/F BAIDU CAMPUS, NO. 10, SHANGDI 10TH STREET HAIDIAN DISTRICT BEIJING, 100085 / CN | [2021/21] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2021/21] | Application number, filing date | 21164266.5 | 23.03.2021 | [2021/21] | Priority number, date | CN202010911924 | 02.09.2020 Original published format: CN202010911924 | [2021/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3825714 | Date: | 26.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3825714 | Date: | 06.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01S5/02, G01S5/14, G01S11/08 | [2021/40] | CPC: |
G08G1/096783 (EP);
G01C21/3804 (KR);
G01C21/30 (EP,CN);
G01C21/3893 (US);
G01C21/32 (US);
G01C21/3815 (KR,US);
G01C21/3848 (KR);
G01C21/387 (KR);
G01C21/3885 (KR);
G01S11/08 (EP);
G01S5/0269 (US);
G01S5/02695 (EP);
G01S5/14 (US);
G06F17/11 (US);
G06Q50/40 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2021/21] | G01S1/20, G01S5/02, G01S5/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG EINER FAHRZEUGINFRASTRUKTUR ZUR KOOPERATIVEN POSITIONIERUNG, ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND AUTONOMES FAHRZEUG | [2021/21] | English: | VEHICLE INFRASTRUCTURE COOPERATIVE POSITIONING METHOD AND APPARATUS, ELECTRONIC DEVICE, AND AUTONOMOUS VEHICLE | [2021/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE POSITIONNEMENT COOPÉRATIF D'INFRASTRUCTURE DE VÉHICULE, DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE ET VÉHICULE AUTONOME | [2021/21] | Examination procedure | 23.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/21] | 06.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.05.2023 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 25.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/41] | 04.06.2023 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2017063018 (CATERPILLAR UNDERGROUND MINING PTY LTD [AU]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US2017299689 (VA VUTHA [US], et al) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [X]US2020077238 (ALEXANDER PAUL DEAN [AU], et al) [X] 1-12 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0069] * * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0080] * * figures 1-7 * * abstract * |