EP3885298 - TEXTILE MACHINE PRODUCING CROSS-WOUND BOBBINS AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A TEXTILE MACHINE FOR CREATING CROSS-WOUND BOBBINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saurer Spinning Solutions GmbH & Co. KG Carlstr. 60 52531 Übach-Palenberg / DE | [2021/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schiffers, Philipp Vossemer Str. 33c 41812 Erkelenz / DE | 02 /
Wassen, Harald Friedensstraße 44 41366 Schwalmtal / DE | 03 /
Sprecher, Jonathan Eckenberger Str. 38 52066 Aachen / DE | 04 /
Prediger, Eduard Ferdinandstr. 20 41061 Mönchengladbach / DE | 05 /
Spitzer, Michael Bahnhofstr. 35 52156 Monschau-Kalterherberg / DE | 06 /
Brakensiek, Prof. Dr. Dirk Wilhelm-Lehmbruck-Str. 50 41470 Neuss / DE | [2021/39] | Representative(s) | Schniedermeyer, Markus Saurer Spinning Solutions GmbH & Co. KG Patentabteilung Carlstraße 60 52531 Übach-Palenberg / DE | [2021/39] | Application number, filing date | 21164438.0 | 24.03.2021 | [2021/39] | Priority number, date | DE202010108339 | 26.03.2020 Original published format: DE102020108339 | [2021/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3885298 | Date: | 29.09.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3885298 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B65H67/06 | [2021/39] | CPC: |
B65H67/068 (EP,CN,US);
B65H51/16 (CN);
B65H67/0405 (US);
B65H67/0417 (CN);
B65H67/063 (EP,US);
B65H67/064 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/18] |
Former [2021/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KREUZSPULEN HERSTELLENDE TEXTILMASCHINE BZW. VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINER KREUZSPULEN HERSTELLENDEN TEXTILMASCHINE | [2021/39] | English: | TEXTILE MACHINE PRODUCING CROSS-WOUND BOBBINS AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A TEXTILE MACHINE FOR CREATING CROSS-WOUND BOBBINS | [2021/39] | French: | MACHINE TEXTILE FABRIQUANT DES BOBINES CROISÉES ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UNE MACHINE TEXTILE FABRIQUANT DES BOBINES CROISÉES | [2021/39] | Examination procedure | 02.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/18] | 29.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 20.03.2024 | FI | 20.03.2024 | HR | 20.03.2024 | LT | 20.03.2024 | LV | 20.03.2024 | NL | 20.03.2024 | SE | 20.03.2024 | NO | 20.06.2024 | RS | 20.06.2024 | GR | 21.06.2024 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/37] | BG | 20.03.2024 | |
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
LV | 20.03.2024 | ||
SE | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | BG | 20.03.2024 | |
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
LV | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 20.03.2024 | |
FI | 20.03.2024 | ||
HR | 20.03.2024 | ||
LT | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.06.2024 | ||
RS | 20.06.2024 | ||
GR | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 20.03.2024 | |
NO | 20.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE2816418 (STAHLECKER FRITZ, et al) [AD] 1-12* pages 9-12; figure 1 *; | [X]EP3382072 (RIETER AG MASCHF [CH]) [X] 1-12 * paragraphs [0007] - [0009] - [0015] , [0020] , [0021] , [0029] , [0031] * | by applicant | DE2816418 | EP0593808 | DE4402143 | DE19905856 | DE4443818 | DE102007057921 | DE102004012254 | DE102017129700 |