Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP3859534 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201280023074 EP12767450 EP21164611 JP2014503683 JP2015138522 KR20137028250 US201113083269 US2012030713W US201514957801 US201715689626



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9778874Global Dossier 03.10.2017B2
US2016085474 24.03.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201514957801 03.12.2015
US201113083269 08.04.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10282128Global Dossier 07.05.2019B2
US2017364301 21.12.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201514957801 03.12.2015
US201715689626 29.08.2017
US201113083269 08.04.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR101532862BGlobal Dossier 30.06.2015B1
KR20130142182 27.12.2013A
Priority number Date
WO2012US30713 27.03.2012
US201113083269 08.04.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2014513345Global Dossier 29.05.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2012US30713 27.03.2012
US201113083269 08.04.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2695065Global Dossier 20.08.2014A4
EP2695065 12.02.2014A2
Priority number Date
WO2012US30713 27.03.2012
US201113083269 08.04.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN103518193BGlobal Dossier 12.10.2016B
CN103518193 15.01.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2012US30713 27.03.2012
US201113083269 08.04.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3859534Global Dossier 04.08.2021A1
Priority number Date
WO2012US30713 27.03.2012
US201113083269 08.04.2011
EP12767450 27.03.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2012138504Global Dossier 27.12.2012A3
WO2012138504 11.10.2012A2
Priority number Date
US201113083269 08.04.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US9223511Global Dossier 29.12.2015B2
US2012260021 11.10.2012A1
Priority number Date
US201113083269 08.04.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP6106719BGlobal Dossier 05.04.2017B2
JP2015212971 26.11.2015A
Priority number Date
US201113083269 08.04.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TWI536384B 01.06.2016B
TW201250688 16.12.2012A
Priority number Date
US201113083269 08.04.2011
TypeType Earlier application
 EP2695065