EP3873119 - METHODS AND DEVICES FOR ENABLING MIGRATION OF A SUBSCRIPTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.03.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2023/39] |
Former [2021/35] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ULLAH, Kazi Wali Honkaportti 5 B 13 02770 Espoo / FI | 02 /
AHMED, Abu Shohel Otsolahdentie 18B 48 02660 Espoo / FI | 03 /
SALMELA, Patrik Sepet-torppa 5 D 02230 Espoo / FI | [2021/35] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2023/39] |
Former [2021/35] | Kransell & Wennborg KB P.O. Box 27834 115 93 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 21164623.7 | 23.06.2016 | [2021/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3873119 | Date: | 01.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3873119 | Date: | 27.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W8/20, H04W8/24 | [2021/35] | CPC: |
H04W8/205 (EP,US);
H04L63/0876 (US);
H04L63/102 (US);
H04W12/041 (US);
H04W12/0471 (US);
H04W12/06 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/14] |
Former [2021/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND GERÄTE ZUR ERMÖGLICHUNG DER MIGRATION EINES ABONNEMENTS | [2021/35] | English: | METHODS AND DEVICES FOR ENABLING MIGRATION OF A SUBSCRIPTION | [2021/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET DISPOSITIFS PERMETTANT LA MIGRATION D'UN ABONNEMENT | [2021/35] | Examination procedure | 01.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/14] | 01.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16732276.7 / EP3476144 | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 27.09.2023 | ES | 27.09.2023 | HR | 27.09.2023 | PL | 27.09.2023 | RO | 27.09.2023 | RS | 27.09.2023 | SK | 27.09.2023 | SM | 27.09.2023 | NO | 27.12.2023 | GR | 28.12.2023 | IS | 27.01.2024 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 27.09.2023 | |
ES | 27.09.2023 | ||
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 27.09.2023 | |
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/11] | HR | 27.09.2023 | |
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 27.12.2023 | |
GR | 28.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2014073292 (KIM KWANLAE [KR], et al); | [Y]CN103747104 (CHINA UNICOM); | [A]US2014357229 (LEE DUCKEY [KR], et al); | [A]EP2905980 (HUAWEI DEVICE CO LTD [CN]); | [Y]US2016044496 (CORMIER JEAN-PHILIPPE PAUL [GB], et al) |