EP4063422 - 1,3-DICARBONYL COMPOUNDS AS RETARDING ADDITIVES FOR UCRETE SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sika Technology AG Zugerstrasse 50 6340 Baar / CH | [2023/33] |
Former [2022/39] | For all designated states Construction Research & Technology GmbH Dr.-Albert-Frank-Str. 32 83308 Trostberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERRES, Antonia 83308 Trostberg / DE | 02 /
STEIDL, Norbert 83308 Trostberg / DE | 03 /
BURKHARD, Walter 83308 Trostberg / DE | 04 /
MÜRKENS, Bettina 83308 Trostberg / DE | 05 /
TASKER. Andrew Southam, CV47 2TN / GB | [2022/39] | Representative(s) | Sika Patent Attorneys C/o Sika Technology AG Corp. IP Dept. Tüffenwies 16 8048 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2022/39] | Witz, Michael Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr. Michael Witz, LL.M. Herzog-Ludwig-Str. 158 83308 Trostberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 21164756.5 | 25.03.2021 | [2022/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4063422 | Date: | 28.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/36, C04B24/28, C04B28/04, C08G18/76, C04B24/00, C08G18/08, C04B24/04, C04B24/12 | [2022/39] | CPC: |
C08G18/36 (EP);
C04B40/065 (EP);
C08G18/089 (EP);
C08G18/7671 (EP);
C04B2111/00482 (EP);
C04B2111/27 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C04B40/065, C04B24/02, C04B24/121, C04B24/124, C04B24/282, C04B28/02 (EP);
C04B40/065, C04B24/02, C04B24/121, C04B24/124, C04B24/282, C04B28/04 (EP);
C04B40/065, C04B7/02, C04B26/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/32] |
Former [2022/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | 1,3-DICARBONYLVERBINDUNGEN ALS VERZÖGERUNGSADDITIVE FÜR UCRETE-SYSTEME | [2022/39] | English: | 1,3-DICARBONYL COMPOUNDS AS RETARDING ADDITIVES FOR UCRETE SYSTEMS | [2022/39] | French: | COMPOSÉS DE 1,3-DICARBONYLE COMME ADDITIFS RETARDATEURS POUR LES SYSTÈMES UCRETE | [2022/39] | Examination procedure | 24.04.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time | 04.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/32] | 04.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 04.07.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 04.07.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.07.2023 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 04.07.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 04.07.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.07.2023 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 04.07.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 04.07.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.07.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   14.07.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2004067419 (ASAHI DENKA KOGYO KK) [X] 1-12* paragraph [0058]; claim 1 *; | [X]WO2018114890 (SIKA TECH AG [CH]) [X] 1-12 * page 11, line 29; claims 1,3 *; | [X]CN110615650 (SHAOGUAN FIRST CONSTRUCTION ENG COMPANY) [X] 1-12 * paragraph [0053]; claim 1 *; | [XD]WO2020164928 (CONSTRUCTION RESEARCH & TECHNOLOGY GMBH [DE]) [XD] 1-13 * examples 9,10,30-32; claim 1 * | by applicant | US3763070 | WO2020164928 | EP20200212956 |