Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
17.05.2024 | Refusal of application | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] |
08.05.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
14.02.2024 | New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused | |
07.02.2024 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | |
31.01.2024 | Change - representative | |
25.06.2023 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | |
20.03.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
20.02.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
03.11.2022 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
28.10.2022 | First examination report | |
21.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant | |
05.11.2021 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 08.12.2021 [2021/49] |
05.11.2021 | Request for examination filed | published on 08.12.2021 [2021/49] |
27.03.2021 | Change - representative |