EP4068551 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PREDICTING FAILURE IN A POWER SYSTEM IN REAL-TIME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.04.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2022/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ranganathan Sathyanarayana, Bharadwaj 560082 Bangalore, Karnataka / IN | [2022/40] | Representative(s) | Patentanwaltskanzlei WILHELM & BECK Prinzenstraße 13 80639 München / DE | [2022/40] | Application number, filing date | 21165553.5 | 29.03.2021 | [2022/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4068551 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4068551 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H02J3/00, H02J13/00 | [2022/40] | CPC: |
H02J13/00002 (EP);
G05B23/0283 (US);
G06N20/00 (US);
G06Q50/06 (US);
H02J3/001 (EP);
H02J2203/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/19] |
Former [2022/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VORHERSAGE EINES AUSFALLS IN EINEM STROMNETZ IN ECHTZEIT | [2022/40] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PREDICTING FAILURE IN A POWER SYSTEM IN REAL-TIME | [2022/40] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉDICTION DE DÉFAILLANCE DANS UN SYSTÈME D'ALIMENTATION EN TEMPS RÉEL | [2022/40] | Examination procedure | 03.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/19] | 03.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 11.10.2023 | ES | 11.10.2023 | HR | 11.10.2023 | PL | 11.10.2023 | RO | 11.10.2023 | RS | 11.10.2023 | SK | 11.10.2023 | SM | 11.10.2023 | NO | 11.01.2024 | GR | 12.01.2024 | IS | 11.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RO | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 11.10.2023 | |
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | ES | 11.10.2023 | |
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 12.01.2024 | |
IS | 11.02.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012078436 (PATEL SURESHCHANDRA B [CA]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP3422517 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2020119556 (SHI DI [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2020184308 (LI FANGXING [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document * |