EP4068551 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PREDICTING FAILURE IN A POWER SYSTEM IN REAL-TIME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Unitary effect registered Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for unitary effect filed Status updated on 17.10.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | New entry: Payment of renewal fee | Proprietor(s) | For all participating member states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2023/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ranganathan Sathyanarayana, Bharadwaj 560082 Bangalore, Karnataka / IN | [2022/40] | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [2023/48] | Application number, filing date | 21165553.5 | 29.03.2021 | [2022/40] | Procedural language | EN | (Principal) place of business Tooltip on the date of filing | Principal place of businessTooltip | Unitary Patent Protection | 17.10.2023 | Date of request for unitary effect [2023/47] | 26.10.2023 | Decision on the request for unitary effect: Positive [2023/48] | 26.10.2023 | Date of registration [2023/48] | 11.10.2023 | Date of legal effect [2023/48] | Member States covered by Unitary Tooltip Patent Protection | 26.10.2023 | AT, BE, BG, DE, DK, EE, FI, FR, IT, LT, LU, LV, MT, NL, PT, SE, SI [2023/48] | Publication | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4068551 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/41] | Renewal fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2024 | Renewal fee unitary effect year 04 |