EP3892911 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR FILLING PRESSURISED GAS TANKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.04.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, SI | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Air Liquide, société anonyme pour l'Étude et l'Exploitation des procédés Georges Claude 75 quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR | [2022/27] |
Former [2021/41] | For all designated states L'Air Liquide - Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75 Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALLIDIERES, laurent 75321 Paris / FR | [2021/41] | Representative(s) | Air Liquide L'Air Liquide S.A. Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2021/41] | Application number, filing date | 21165753.1 | 30.03.2021 | [2021/41] | Priority number, date | FR20200003616 | 10.04.2020 Original published format: FR 2003616 | [2021/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3892911 | Date: | 13.10.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3892911 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F17C5/06 | [2021/41] | CPC: |
F17C5/06 (EP,CN,KR,US);
F17C13/02 (KR);
F17C13/04 (CN);
F17C5/007 (KR);
F17C2201/0109 (EP);
F17C2201/054 (EP);
F17C2205/0142 (EP);
F17C2205/0146 (EP);
F17C2205/0326 (EP,KR);
F17C2221/012 (EP,KR,US);
F17C2223/0123 (EP,US);
F17C2223/0161 (EP);
F17C2223/036 (EP);
F17C2225/0123 (EP,US);
F17C2225/036 (EP);
F17C2227/0135 (CN);
F17C2227/0157 (EP,CN,US);
F17C2227/043 (EP);
F17C2250/032 (US);
F17C2250/034 (EP);
F17C2250/0689 (US);
F17C2265/065 (EP,KR,US);
F17C2270/0139 (KR);
F17C2270/0168 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] |
Former [2021/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FÜLLVORRICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN FÜR UNTER DRUCK STEHENDE GASTANKS | [2021/41] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR FILLING PRESSURISED GAS TANKS | [2021/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE REMPLISSAGE DE RÉSERVOIRS DE GAZ SOUS PRESSION | [2021/41] | Examination procedure | 13.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/20] | 13.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.06.2023 | CZ | 07.06.2023 | EE | 07.06.2023 | ES | 07.06.2023 | FI | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | IT | 07.06.2023 | LT | 07.06.2023 | LV | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SE | 07.06.2023 | SI | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | PT | 09.10.2023 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/10] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 07.06.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP3409998 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [A]US2019178447 (POORMAN RICHARD ALLAN [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * figure 1 * |