EP4067245 - STORAGE AND DISCHARGE STATION FOR A BLISTER MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.03.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | Change - classification | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | 03.10.2024 | Change - classification | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Becton Dickinson Rowa Germany GmbH Rowastraße 1 53539 Kelberg / DE | [2022/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmidt-Ellinger, Hardy 54568 Gerolstein-Bewing / DE | 02 /
Jünger, Thomas 56767 Oberelz / DE | [2022/40] | Representative(s) | Zenz Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Gutenbergstraße 39 45128 Essen / DE | [2022/40] | Application number, filing date | 21166127.7 | 31.03.2021 | [2022/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4067245 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B65B35/08, G07F17/00, // G07F11/24 | [2022/40] | CPC: |
B65B35/08 (EP,KR);
G07F11/004 (EP);
G07F11/005 (EP);
G07F11/24 (EP);
G07F11/44 (EP);
G07F17/0092 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/15] |
Former [2022/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRATS- UND ABGABESTATION FÜR EINEN BLISTERAUTOMATEN | [2022/40] | English: | STORAGE AND DISCHARGE STATION FOR A BLISTER MACHINE | [2022/40] | French: | STATION DE STOCKAGE ET DE DISTRIBUTION POUR UN DISTRIBUTEUR AUTOMATIQUE DE BLISTER | [2022/40] | Examination procedure | 07.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/15] | 07.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH0710105 (TOKYO SHOKAI KK); | [Y]EP2644512 (CRETEM CO LTD [KR]); | [A]EP2962956 (CAREFUSION GERMANY 326 GMBH [DE]); | [XY]EP3406237 (TOSHO INC [JP]) | by applicant | WO2013034504 |