EP3919626 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR LABELING CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.12.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.06.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | 07.06.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 10X Genomics, Inc. 6230 Stoneridge Mall Road Pleasanton, CA 94588-3260 / US | [2024/28] |
Former [2021/49] | For all designated states 10X Genomics, Inc. 6230 Stoneridge Mall Road Pleasanton, CA 94588-3260 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOUTET, Stephane Claude Pleasanton, California 94588-3260 / US | 02 /
LUCERO, Michael Ybarra Pleasanton, California 94588-3260 / US | 03 /
MIKKELSEN, Tarjei Sigurd Pleasanton, California 94588-3260 / US | 04 /
PFEIFFER, Katherine Pleasanton, California 94588-3260 / US | [2021/49] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2024/28] |
Former [2021/49] | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 21166292.9 | 07.12.2018 | [2021/49] | Priority number, date | US201762596557P | 08.12.2017 Original published format: US 201762596557 P | US201816107685 | 21.08.2018 Original published format: US201816107685 | US201862723960P | 28.08.2018 Original published format: US 201862723960 P | [2021/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3919626 | Date: | 08.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3919626 | Date: | 10.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/6816, C12Q1/6806 | [2021/49] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6816 (EP,CN);
C12Q1/6806 (EP,CN,US);
C12Q1/6886 (US);
C12N15/1013 (CN,US);
C12Q1/6804 (US);
C12Q1/6881 (US);
G16B30/00 (US);
G16B30/10 (CN);
G16B50/00 (US);
B01L2300/0819 (US);
B01L3/5085 (US);
B01L3/50857 (US);
C12M3/08 (US);
C12N15/1065 (US);
C12N5/10 (US);
| C-Set: |
C12N15/1013, C12Q2563/185, C12Q2563/143, C12Q2563/149, C12Q2563/159, C12Q2565/631 (CN);
C12Q1/6806, C12Q2563/159, C12Q2563/179 (EP);
C12Q1/6806, C12Q2563/185, C12Q2563/159, C12Q2565/631 (CN);
C12Q1/6816, C12Q2563/159, C12Q2563/179 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/28] |
Former [2021/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR MARKIERUNG VON ZELLEN | [2021/49] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR LABELING CELLS | [2021/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET COMPOSITIONS POUR LE MARQUAGE DE CELLULES | [2021/49] | Examination procedure | 06.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/28] | 06.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 07.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18829641.2 / EP3568494 | Divisional application(s) | EP24179541.8 / EP4403644 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0034527 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]); | [A]WO2014072703 (OXFORD NANOPORE TECH LTD [GB]); | [A]US2015211056 (UM SOONG HO [KR], et al); | [A]WO2016100976 (APPRISE BIO INC [US], et al); | by applicant | US2010105112 | US2014155295 | US2014378345 | US2015292988 | US2015376609 | US9951386 | US10011872 | US10030267 | US10041116 |