EP3925622 - COMBINATION THERAPIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.11.2022 [2022/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | [2021/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEBWOHL, David East Hanover, New Jersey 07936 / US | 02 /
PETERS, Malte 80469 Munchen / DE | [2021/51] | Representative(s) | Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [2021/51] | Application number, filing date | 21166347.1 | 11.09.2015 | [2021/51] | Priority number, date | US201462050116P | 13.09.2014 Original published format: US 201462050116 P | US201462059788P | 03.10.2014 Original published format: US 201462059788 P | US201562119060P | 20.02.2015 Original published format: US 201562119060 P | US201562199030P | 30.07.2015 Original published format: US 201562199030 P | [2021/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3925622 | Date: | 22.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, A61K31/506, A61P35/00, C07K16/28 | [2021/51] | CPC: |
A61K31/506 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K31/495 (RU);
A61K39/39558 (CN,KR,US);
A61K31/55 (US);
A61K39/395 (RU);
A61K9/0053 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP,RU);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K16/28 (US);
C07K16/2803 (US);
C07K16/2818 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07K16/2827 (US);
C07K16/3023 (US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K2039/54 (US);
A61K2039/542 (US);
A61K2039/545 (CN,US);
A61K2300/00 (KR);
C07K2317/21 (US);
C07K2317/73 (CN,KR);
C07K2317/76 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/506, A61K2300/00 (US,CN,EP);
A61K39/39558, A61K2300/00 (CN,EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMBINATIONSTHERAPIEN | [2021/51] | English: | COMBINATION THERAPIES | [2021/51] | French: | POLYTHÉRAPIES | [2021/51] | Examination procedure | 23.06.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/48] | 13.07.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/48] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15767683.4 / EP3191097 | EP19199437.5 / EP3659621 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2011159877 (BRIGHAM & WOMENS HOSPITAL [US], et al); | [I]WO2013019906 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al); | by applicant | FR901228 | US2779780 | EP0125023 | EP0171496 | EP0173494 | WO8601533 | EP0184187 | GB2188638 | US4816567 | WO9002809 | EP0388151 | WO9100906 | WO9110741 | WO9117271 | WO9201047 | WO9203918 | WO9203917 | WO9209690 | WO9215679 | WO9218619 | WO9220791 | EP0519596 | WO9301288 | US5208020 | US5223409 | US5225539 | WO9404678 | WO9410202 | US5475092 | WO9630046 | US5585089 | US5585499 | US5624821 | US5648260 | US5693761 | US5693762 | US5811097 | WO9845332 | US5846545 | WO9920758 | WO9940196 | WO9952552 | US6054297 | WO0035436 | US6111090 | WO0103720 | WO0206213 | EP0666868 | WO02066470 | US6582959 | WO03064383 | WO03076424 | WO03077914 | US2003190317 | US2003203409 | US2003206899 | WO2004005281 | US6689607 | US6703020 | US2004047858 | WO2004060319 | US6780996 | WO2005007190 | WO2005012359 | US6884879 | WO2005044853 | US2005112126 | WO2005055808 | US2005186208 | WO2005113556 | WO2005115451 | WO2005121142 | US2006009360 | WO2006028958 | US7025962 | US7060269 | WO2006083289 | US7132255 | WO2006121168 | WO2006122806 | WO2007005874 | WO2007004415 | US7169791 | WO2007014011 | WO2007084786 | WO2007133822 | EP1866339 | WO2008024725 | EP0920505 | WO2008073687 | WO2009036082 | WO2009055730 | WO2009085983 | WO2009101611 | EP2099447 | WO2009114335 | WO2009114870 | US7618632 | WO2010003118 | WO2010006086 | US2010028330 | WO2010019570 | WO2010027827 | WO2010029082 | WO2010036380 | WO2010077634 | US7767675 | US7812135 | WO2010125571 | WO2011025927 | WO2011028683 | WO2011051726 | US7943743 | WO2011066342 | US2011150892 | WO2011090754 | US8008449 | US8039479 | WO2011155607 | US2012039906 | US2012114649 | WO2012079000 | WO2012177624 | US8354509 | WO2013019906 | US8388967 | WO2013039954 | US8415355 | EP2581113 | WO2013054331 | WO2013079174 | WO2013082366 | EP1947183 | US8501758 | US8552156 | US8552002 | US8586023 | US8591886 | WO2013179174 | WO2013184757 | US8609089 | WO2014008218 | WO2014012479 | WO2014022332 | US2014044728 | US2014072566 | US8685980 | WO2014059251 | US8709424 | US2014271618 | WO2015026684 | WO1986US02269 |