EP3822878 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FORECASTING DEMAND FOR TALENT, DEVICE, STORAGE MEDIUM, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.04.2023 [2023/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baidu Online Network Technology (Beijing) Co., Ltd. 3/F Baidu Campus No. 10, Shangdi 10th Street Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2021/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Qi c/o Baidu Online Network Technology (Beijing) Co., Ltd. 3/F Baidu Campus No. 10, Shangdi 10th Street, Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | 02 /
ZHU, Hengshu c/o Baidu Online Network Technology (Beijing) Co., Ltd. 3/F Baidu Campus No. 10, Shangdi 10th Street, Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Peng c/o Baidu Online Network Technology (Beijing) Co., Ltd. 3/F Baidu Campus No. 10, Shangdi 10th Street, Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | 04 /
SUN, Ying c/o Baidu Online Network Technology (Beijing) Co., Ltd. 3/F Baidu Campus No. 10, Shangdi 10th Street, Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2021/20] | Representative(s) | Lucke, Andreas Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2021/20] | Application number, filing date | 21166353.9 | 31.03.2021 | [2021/20] | Priority number, date | CN202010383717 | 08.05.2020 Original published format: CN202010383717 | [2021/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3822878 | Date: | 19.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3822878 | Date: | 03.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/04, G06Q10/10 | [2021/44] | CPC: |
G06Q10/04 (EP,CN,US);
G06Q10/06375 (KR);
G06Q10/105 (EP,CN,KR);
G06F18/2148 (US);
G06F18/25 (US);
G06N20/00 (CN);
G06N3/08 (US);
G06Q10/06315 (KR);
G06Q10/0633 (KR);
G06Q30/0202 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/20] | G06Q10/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VORHERSAGE DER NACHFRAGE NACH TALENTEN, VORRICHTUNG, SPEICHERMEDIUM UND COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT | [2021/22] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FORECASTING DEMAND FOR TALENT, DEVICE, STORAGE MEDIUM, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT | [2021/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR PRÉVOIR LA DEMANDE DE TALENT, DISPOSITIF, SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT ET PRODUIT PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE | [2021/22] |
Former [2021/20] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VORHERSAGE DER NACHFRAGE NACH TALENTEN, VORRICHTUNG, SPEICHERMEDIUM, UND COMPUTERPROGRAMM-PRODUKT | ||
Former [2021/20] | MÉTHODE ET APPAREIL POUR PRÉVOIR LA DEMANDE DE TALENTS. DISPOSITIF, SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE, ET PRODUIT DE PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE | Examination procedure | 31.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/20] | 02.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/15] | 05.12.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/15] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2019130425 (LEI MING [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0034] *; | [I]US10467533 (KUMAR KRITI [IN], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0009] ** paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0015] * |