EP4067039 - A METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A SHELL OF A WIND TURBINE BLADE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.09.2023 [2023/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LM Wind Power A/S Jupitervej 6 6000 Kolding / DK | [2022/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KNOBLOCK, Jasper New Orleans, LA 70129 / US | [2022/40] | Representative(s) | COPA Copenhagen Patents Rosenørns Allé 1, 2nd floor 1970 Frederiksberg C / DK | [2022/40] | Application number, filing date | 21166406.5 | 31.03.2021 | [2022/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4067039 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B29C33/14, B29C70/42, B29C70/54, B29D99/00 | [2022/40] | CPC: |
B29C70/42 (EP);
B29C33/14 (EP);
B29C70/541 (EP);
B29C70/543 (EP);
B29D99/0028 (EP);
B29C33/16 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER SCHALE EINER WINDTURBINENSCHAUFEL | [2022/40] | English: | A METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A SHELL OF A WIND TURBINE BLADE | [2022/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE COQUE D'UNE PALE DE TURBINE ÉOLIENNE | [2022/40] | Examination procedure | 06.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/38] | 02.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP2918404 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5,11-15 * paragraphs [0030] , [0035] , [0036] , [0045] , [0046] , [0050] , [0056]; figure - * [Y] 6-10; | [Y]US2016101575 (ASHTARI NICOLAS [FR], et al) [Y] 10 * paragraph [0066] *; | [A]US2018154593 (HUNTER ROBERT [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2020127926 (MHI VESTAS OFFSHORE WIND AS [DK]) [Y] 7* page 9, lines 21-28 *; | [XY]US2020269536 (NIELSEN LARS [DK]) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0026] , [0027] , [0034] , [0056]; figure - * [Y] 6-10 |