EP4068711 - METHOD OF CHANNEL ESTIMATION IN A COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AS WELL AS SIGNAL PROCESSING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.10.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rohde & Schwarz GmbH & Co. KG Mühldorfstrasse 15 81671 München / DE | [2022/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krakowski, Claudiu 81671 München / DE | 02 /
Petrovic, Niels 81671 München / DE | [2022/40] | Representative(s) | Prinz & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [2022/40] | Application number, filing date | 21166453.7 | 31.03.2021 | [2022/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4068711 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/02 | [2022/40] | CPC: |
H04L25/0204 (EP);
H04L25/0202 (CN);
H04L25/025 (EP,US);
H04B7/0413 (CN);
H04L25/0224 (US);
H04L25/0244 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/10] |
Former [2022/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KANALSCHÄTZUNG IN EINEM KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM SOWIE SIGNALVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM | [2022/40] | English: | METHOD OF CHANNEL ESTIMATION IN A COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AS WELL AS SIGNAL PROCESSING SYSTEM | [2022/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ESTIMATION DE CANAL DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION ET SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT DE SIGNAL | [2022/40] | Examination procedure | 31.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/10] | 31.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.10.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2015124911 (WICKER JR DAVID JENNINGS [US], et al); |