EP3866351 - UPLINK MIMO CODEBOOK FOR ADVANCED WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/18] |
Former [2021/33] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Gyeonggi-do Suwon-si 16677 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAHMAN, Md Saifur Suwon-si, 16677 / KR | 02 /
ONGGOSANUSI, Eko Suwon-si, 16677 / KR | [2023/18] |
Former [2021/33] | 01 /
RAHMAN, Md Saifur 16677 Suwon-si / KR | ||
02 /
ONGGOSANUSI, Eko 16677 Suwon-si / KR | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2023/18] |
Former [2021/33] | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 21166993.2 | 22.12.2017 | [2021/33] | Priority number, date | US201662437836P | 22.12.2016 Original published format: US 201662437836 P | US201762455263P | 06.02.2017 Original published format: US 201762455263 P | US201762520707P | 16.06.2017 Original published format: US 201762520707 P | US201762563717P | 27.09.2017 Original published format: US 201762563717 P | US201762569069P | 06.10.2017 Original published format: US 201762569069 P | US201762569914P | 09.10.2017 Original published format: US 201762569914 P | US201762575026P | 20.10.2017 Original published format: US 201762575026 P | US201762576868P | 25.10.2017 Original published format: US 201762576868 P | US201762579562P | 31.10.2017 Original published format: US 201762579562 P | US201762581600P | 03.11.2017 Original published format: US 201762581600 P | US201762590907P | 27.11.2017 Original published format: US 201762590907 P | US201762591364P | 28.11.2017 Original published format: US 201762591364 P | US201762593478P | 01.12.2017 Original published format: US 201762593478 P | US201715844292 | 15.12.2017 Original published format: US201715844292 | [2021/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3866351 | Date: | 18.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3866351 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/06, H04B7/0456, H04B7/0404 | [2021/33] | CPC: |
H04B7/0486 (EP,US);
H04B7/0639 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/06 (CN);
H04B7/0404 (CN,KR);
H04B7/0456 (CN,KR);
H04B7/0645 (EP);
H04W72/23 (US);
H04B7/0617 (US);
H04B7/0628 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/43] |
Former [2021/33] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | UPLINK-MIMO-CODEBUCH FÜR ERWEITERTE DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEME | [2021/33] | English: | UPLINK MIMO CODEBOOK FOR ADVANCED WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS | [2021/33] | French: | LIVRE DE CODES POUR ENTRÉE MULTIPLE SORTIE MULTIPLE (MIMO) DE LIAISON MONTANTE POUR DES SYSTÈMES DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL ÉVOLUÉS | [2022/49] |
Former [2021/33] | LIVRE DE CODE MIMO EN LIAISON MONTANTE POUR SYSTÈMES DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL AVANCÉS | Examination procedure | 21.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/43] | 21.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17884044.3 / EP3542465 | Divisional application(s) | EP23171182.1 / EP4236093 | EP24175617.0 / EP4395189 | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.05.2023 | CZ | 03.05.2023 | DK | 03.05.2023 | EE | 03.05.2023 | FI | 03.05.2023 | HR | 03.05.2023 | IT | 03.05.2023 | LT | 03.05.2023 | LV | 03.05.2023 | MC | 03.05.2023 | PL | 03.05.2023 | RO | 03.05.2023 | RS | 03.05.2023 | SE | 03.05.2023 | SI | 03.05.2023 | SK | 03.05.2023 | SM | 03.05.2023 | NO | 03.08.2023 | GR | 04.08.2023 | IS | 03.09.2023 | PT | 04.09.2023 | LU | 22.12.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/27] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
CZ | 03.05.2023 | ||
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
IT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SI | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
CZ | 03.05.2023 | ||
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | PT | 04.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2010095884 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al); | [A]US2012328031 (PAJUKOSKI KARI P [FI], et al) |