blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3878495

EP3878495 - MULTIPLE USE DISPOSABLE INJECTION PEN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.05.2024
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.01.2024
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  17.12.2021
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  13.08.2021
Most recent event   Tooltip23.03.2025New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Becton, Dickinson and Company
1 Becton Drive
Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417-1880 / US
[2021/37]
Inventor(s)01 / CRONENBERG, Richard
108 Kohout Drive
Mahwah, NJ 07430 / US
02 / QUINN, Michael
42 Tiffany Drive
East Hanover, NJ 07936 / US
 [2021/37]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstraße 3
81675 München / DE
[2021/37]
Application number, filing date21167306.615.03.2012
[2021/37]
Priority number, dateUS201161457391P16.03.2011         Original published format: US 201161457391 P
[2021/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3878495
Date:15.09.2021
Language:EN
[2021/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3878495
Date:12.06.2024
Language:EN
[2024/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.06.2021
ClassificationIPC:A61M5/315, A61M5/20, A61M5/24
[2021/37]
CPC:
A61M5/31541 (EP,CN,RU,US); A61M5/178 (CN); A61M3/00 (RU);
A61M5/31501 (CN); A61M5/31511 (CN); A61M5/31525 (CN);
A61M5/31528 (EP,US); A61M5/31533 (RU); A61M5/31535 (EP,US);
A61M5/31548 (CN); A61M5/31551 (EP,RU,US); A61M5/31566 (CN);
A61M5/31575 (EP,US); A61M5/31576 (CN); A61M5/31585 (EP,RU,US);
A61M2005/2407 (EP,US); A61M2005/3126 (CN); A61M2005/3152 (EP,US);
A61M2205/581 (EP,US); A61M2205/582 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2022/03]
Former [2021/37]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:WEGWERFBARER, MEHRFACH VERWENDBARER INJEKTIONSSTIFT[2021/37]
English:MULTIPLE USE DISPOSABLE INJECTION PEN[2021/37]
French:STYLO D'INJECTION JETABLE À USAGE MULTIPLE[2021/37]
Examination procedure15.12.2021Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.12.2021Examination requested  [2022/03]
15.12.2021Date on which the examining division has become responsible
09.01.2024Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.05.2024Fee for grant paid
02.05.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.05.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP12757996.9  / EP2686041
EP17210309.5  / EP3323449
EP19173304.7  / EP3542843
Divisional application(s)EP24181357.5  / EP4410330
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  12.03.2025  13.03.2025  ADMISSIBLE
Inspicos P/S
Agern Allé 24
2970 Hørsholm / DK
Opponent's representative
Inspicos P/S
Agern Allé 24
2970 Hørsholm / DK
 [2025/16]
24.03.2025Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.05.2021Renewal fee patent year 03
08.05.2021Renewal fee patent year 04
08.05.2021Renewal fee patent year 05
08.05.2021Renewal fee patent year 06
08.05.2021Renewal fee patent year 07
08.05.2021Renewal fee patent year 08
08.05.2021Renewal fee patent year 09
08.05.2021Renewal fee patent year 10
23.03.2022Renewal fee patent year 11
21.03.2023Renewal fee patent year 12
20.03.2024Renewal fee patent year 13
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBG12.06.2024
EE12.06.2024
HR12.06.2024
LV12.06.2024
RO12.06.2024
SK12.06.2024
SM12.06.2024
RS12.09.2024
GR13.09.2024
IS12.10.2024
PT14.10.2024
[2025/10]
Former [2025/09]BG12.06.2024
EE12.06.2024
HR12.06.2024
LV12.06.2024
RS12.09.2024
GR13.09.2024
IS12.10.2024
PT14.10.2024
Former [2025/03]BG12.06.2024
HR12.06.2024
LV12.06.2024
RS12.09.2024
GR13.09.2024
PT14.10.2024
Former [2024/49]BG12.06.2024
HR12.06.2024
LV12.06.2024
RS12.09.2024
GR13.09.2024
Former [2024/47]BG12.06.2024
HR12.06.2024
GR13.09.2024
Documents cited:Search[A]WO0110484  (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US], et al);
 [Y]US2005113765  (VEASEY ROBERT F [GB], et al);
 [Y]US2007244436  (SAIKI MASARU [JP]);
 [Y]US2008027397  (DERUNTZ OTTO D [US], et al);
 [Y]US2008195057  (GRAF RONEY [CH], et al)
ExaminationWO2013116951
OppositionUS2005177116
 US2007016143
 WO2011068531
 WO2012017036
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.