EP3893549 - TERMINAL ROAMING METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND COMPUTER-READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.01.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MA, Zhi Shenzhen 518129 / CN | 02 /
BAI, Xiaofei Shenzhen 518129 / CN | 03 /
DING, Guozhi Shenzhen 518129 / CN | 04 /
GUO, Yongkang Shenzhen 518129 / CN | [2021/41] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2021/41] | Application number, filing date | 21167365.2 | 08.04.2021 | [2021/41] | Priority number, date | CN202010281300 | 10.04.2020 Original published format: CN202010281300 | [2021/41] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3893549 | Date: | 13.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/00, // H04W36/08, H04W36/36, H04W84/12 | [2021/41] | CPC: |
H04W36/0016 (EP);
H04W8/02 (CN);
H04W8/12 (US);
H04W68/005 (US);
H04W76/11 (US);
H04W8/06 (US);
H04W8/08 (CN);
H04W8/26 (US);
H04W36/0064 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/07] |
Former [2021/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENDGERÄTE-ROAMING-VERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG SOWIE COMPUTERLESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2021/41] | English: | TERMINAL ROAMING METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND COMPUTER-READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM | [2021/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'ITINÉRANCE DE TERMINAL ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR | [2021/41] | Examination procedure | 06.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/07] | 06.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2007149509 (INTERDIGITAL TECH CORP [US], et al); | [YA]EP2975883 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [YA]EP3457756 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [YA]US2019268818 (YI SEUNGJUNE [KR], et al); | [A]WO2019223679 (ZTE CORP [CN]); |