Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP3872586 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3872586



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 438
29.05.2024 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.05.2024 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
29.05.2024 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
13.02.2024 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
13.02.2024 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
05.05.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.05.2023 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
05.05.2023 Claims Search / examination 2
05.05.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.05.2023 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
05.04.2023 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
05.04.2023 Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments Search / examination 2
31.03.2023 Examination started Search / examination 1
25.07.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.07.2022 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
25.07.2022 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
25.07.2022 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 37
25.07.2022 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 47
25.07.2022 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
25.07.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
31.01.2022 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 2
23.12.2021 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
23.12.2021 European search opinion Search / examination 7
23.12.2021 European search report Search / examination 2
23.12.2021 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
22.12.2021 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
30.11.2021 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
30.11.2021 Declaration that a search is not possible Search / examination 3
30.11.2021 European search opinion Search / examination 2
30.11.2021 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
25.11.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.11.2021 Annex Search / examination 2
25.11.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
25.11.2021 Reply to the invitation to clarify the claims/the subject matter of the application Search / examination 2
04.08.2021 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
02.07.2021 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
02.07.2021 Invitation to indicate the subject-matter to be searched Search / examination 2
29.06.2021 Search started Search / examination 1
04.05.2021 Divisionals: confirmation of receipt of missing parts Search / examination 2
22.04.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.04.2021 (Partial) set of drawings filed in response to formal objections Search / examination 4
22.04.2021 Invitation to file missing parts of description/drawings Search / examination 2
22.04.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
08.04.2021 Abstract Search / examination 1
08.04.2021 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
08.04.2021 Claims Search / examination 2
08.04.2021 Description Search / examination 58
08.04.2021 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
08.04.2021 Drawings Search / examination 13
08.04.2021 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
23.12.2015 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 76
23.12.2015 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 121