EP3882500 - VALVE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.03.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Neoperl GmbH Klosterrunsstr. 9-11 79379 Müllheim / DE | [2021/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIAN, Yichao Schlossgartenstr. 12a 79379 Müllheim / DE | 02 /
TEMPEL, Marc Speckbacherweg 2 79111 Freiburg / DE | [2021/38] | Representative(s) | Mertzlufft-Paufler, Cornelius, et al Maucher Jenkins Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Urachstraße 23 79102 Freiburg im Breisgau / DE | [2021/38] | Application number, filing date | 21167560.8 | 13.06.2018 | [2021/38] | Priority number, date | DE201720105426U | 07.09.2017 Original published format: DE 202017105426 U | [2021/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3882500 | Date: | 22.09.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F16K31/385, F16K7/17 | [2021/38] | CPC: |
F16K31/385 (EP,US);
F16K31/365 (CN,US);
F16K31/145 (CN);
F16K7/17 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/16] |
Former [2021/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VENTILANORDNUNG | [2021/38] | English: | VALVE ASSEMBLY | [2021/38] | French: | AGENCEMENT DE SOUPAPE | [2021/38] | Examination procedure | 16.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/16] | 16.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/11] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18731419.0 / EP3679282 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US5213303 (WALKER SAMUEL C [US]) [X] 1,2,4,6-8,11,13 * column 3, line 36 - column 6, line 18; figures 1,2 * [Y] 5,9,10,15,16 [I] 3,12,14,17; | [Y]WO9705416 (KELLER MYRON [US]) [Y] 5,9,10,15,16* abstract * |