EP3878364 - AN AUTOMATIC METHOD TO DELINEATE OR CATEGORIZE AN ELECTROCARDIOGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.12.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.03.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2023/39] |
Former [2021/37] | For all designated states Cardiologs Technologies 38 rue Dunois 75647 Paris Cedex 13 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAPIN, Jérémy 5 Rue Campagne Première 75014 Paris / FR | 02 /
LI, Jia 106 rue du Cherche-Midi 75006 Paris / FR | 03 /
MASSIAS, Mathurin 52 Rue Rémy Dumoncel 75014 Paris / FR | [2021/37] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2021/37] | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21167613.5 | 27.10.2016 | [2021/37] | Priority number, date | EP20150191769 | 27.10.2015 Original published format: EP 15191769 | US201514924239 | 27.10.2015 Original published format: US201514924239 | [2021/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3878364 | Date: | 15.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/349 | [2021/37] | CPC: |
A61B5/7264 (EP);
A61B5/349 (EP);
A61B5/7282 (EP);
G16H50/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/16] |
Former [2021/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHES VERFAHREN ZUR DARSTELLUNG ODER KATEGORISIERUNG EINES ELEKTROKARDIOGRAMMS | [2021/37] | English: | AN AUTOMATIC METHOD TO DELINEATE OR CATEGORIZE AN ELECTROCARDIOGRAM | [2021/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ AUTOMATIQUE POUR DÉLIMITER OU CATÉGORISER UN ÉLECTROCARDIOGRAMME | [2021/37] | Examination procedure | 10.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/16] | 10.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/19] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16787481.7 / EP3367897 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005222508 (MORENO PEDRO J [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]EP2030565 (MEDICALGORITHMICS SP Z O O [PL]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0074] *; | [A]US2013237776 (ONG MARCUS ENG HOCK [SG], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0013] *; | [X]CN104970789 (SUZHOU INST NANO TECH & NANO B) [X] 1-15 * abstract *; | [X] - Jin Linpeng, "Electrocardiogram classification method and system, abstract of CN104970789", (20151014), URL: epodoc, (20160413), XP055264877 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * | [X] - KIRANYAZ S ET AL, "Convolutional Neural Networks for patient-specific ECG classification", 2015 37TH ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE OF THE IEEE ENGINEERING IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY SOCIETY (EMBC). PROCEEDINGS IEEE PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (201508), ISBN 978-1-4244-9270-1, pages 2608 - 2611, XP002756380 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/EMBC.2015.7318926 | [X] - SERKAN KIRANYAZ ET AL, "Real-Time Patient-Specific ECG Classification by 1-D Convolutional Neural Networks", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON BIOMEDICAL ENGINEERING., PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA., (20150814), vol. 63, no. 3, doi:10.1109/TBME.2015.2468589, ISSN 0018-9294, pages 664 - 675, XP055264879 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TBME.2015.2468589 | by applicant | US8332017 | US2014148714 | US8903479 | CN104970789 | - MARTINEZ et al., IEEE transactions on biomedical engineering, (20040400), vol. 51, no. 4, pages 570 - 581 | - ALMEIDA et al., IEEE transactions on biomedical engineering, (20090800), vol. 56, no. 8, pages 1996 - 2005 | - BOICHAT et al., Proceedings of Wearable and Implantable Body Sensor Networks, (20090000), pages 256 - 261 | - COAST et al., IEEE transactions on biomedical engineering, (19900900), vol. 37, no. 9, pages 826 - 836 | - HUGHES et al., Proceedings of Neural Information Processing Systems, (20040000), pages 611 - 618 | - CHAZAL et al., IEEE Transactions on Biomedical Engineering, (20040000), vol. 51, pages 1196 - 1206 | - KIRANYAZ et al., IEEE Transactions on Biomedical Engineering, (20160000), vol. 63, pages 664 - 675 | - SHEN et al., Biomedical Engineering and Informatics (BMEI), (20100000), vol. 3, pages 960 - 964 | - JINDONG, Science China Press, (20150000), vol. 45, no. 3, pages 398 - 416 | - CHRISTOV et al., BioMedical Engineering OnLine, (20060000), vol. 5, pages 31 - 38 | - ROSENBLATT, Psychological Review, (19580000), vol. 65, no. 6, pages 386 - 408 | - CYBENKO, Math. Control Signals Systems, (19890000), vol. 2, pages 303 - 314 | - FUKUSHIMA, Biol. Cybernetics, (19800000), vol. 36, pages 193 - 202 | - LECUN et al., Neural Computation, (19890000), vol. 1, pages 541 - 551 | - LONG et al., Proceedings of Computer Vision and Pattern Recognition, (20150000), pages 3431 - 3440 | - KRIZHEVSK et al., Proceedings of Neural Information Processing Systems, (20120000), pages 1097 - 1105 | - PIGOLISANGALLI, Computational Statistics and Data Analysis, (20120000), vol. 56, pages 1482 - 1498 | - KAUR et al., Proceedings published by International Journal of Computer Applications, (20110000), pages 30 - 36 | - MOODY et al., Computers in Cardiology, (19900000), vol. 17, pages 185 - 188 |