EP3901362 - MULTI-LAYERED COATING FOR FABRICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.09.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 300 S. Tryon Street, Suite 600 Charlotte, NC 28202 / US | [2021/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YE, Tianshi Intellectual Property Services Group 300 S. Tryon Street, Suite 600 Charlotte, NC 28202 / US | 02 /
CHEN, Xiaowei Intellectual Property Services Group 300 S. Tryon Street, Suite 600 Charlotte, NC 28202 / US | 03 /
ZHANG, Jing Intellectual Property Services Group 300 S. Tryon Street, Suite 600 Charlotte, NC 28202 / US | [2021/43] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [2021/43] | Application number, filing date | 21167938.6 | 12.04.2021 | [2021/43] | Priority number, date | CN202010333804 | 24.04.2020 Original published format: CN202010333804 | [2021/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3901362 | Date: | 27.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | D06M15/693, D06M13/188, D06M11/65, D06M23/16, D06N3/00, D06N3/10, D06N3/18, A41D19/00, A41D19/015, C08J7/04, C08J9/28, B32B27/12, B32B5/24, B32B5/32 | [2021/43] | CPC: |
D06M15/693 (EP,US);
D06N3/106 (EP,CN,US);
A41D19/0065 (EP,US);
A41D19/0006 (CN);
A41D19/015 (CN);
A41D19/01558 (US);
D06M11/65 (EP,CN,US);
D06M13/188 (EP,CN);
D06M23/16 (EP);
D06N3/0006 (EP);
D06N3/0009 (EP);
D06N3/0034 (CN);
D06N3/0043 (CN,US);
D06N3/0052 (EP);
D06N3/0077 (CN);
D06N3/103 (EP,US);
D06N3/183 (EP,US);
B05D1/36 (EP);
B05D2203/00 (EP);
B05D3/0254 (EP);
B05D7/56 (EP);
C08J2201/026 (EP);
C08J2309/04 (EP);
C08J9/28 (EP);
D06N2209/105 (EP);
D06N2209/106 (EP);
D06N2209/125 (EP);
D06N2209/126 (EP);
D06N2209/1685 (CN);
D06N2211/103 (CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEHR-BESCHICHTETE BESCHICHTUNG FÜR GEWEBE | [2021/43] | English: | MULTI-LAYERED COATING FOR FABRICS | [2021/43] | French: | REVÊTEMENT MULTI-COUCHES POUR TISSUS | [2021/43] | Examination procedure | 12.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/43] | 26.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1671555 (SHOWA CO [JP]); | [Y]US2007259984 (DORR SEBASTIAN [DE], et al); | [A]EP2143551 (TOWA CORP LTD [JP]); | [Y]US2015135403 (MERCADO AGUSTIN PORTILLO [MX], et al); | [Y]WO2016141409 (ANSELL LTD [AU]) |