EP3895546 - METHOD FOR REDUCING THE MICROBIAL LOAD OF A LIQUID AND RELATED APPARATUS FOR CARRYING IT OUT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Waxy S.R.L.S. Via Amico Canobio, 4/6 28100 Novara / IT | [2021/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FONTANA, Mauro 10045 Piossasco (TO) / IT | 02 /
BISOTTI, Stefano 29121 Piacenza / IT | 03 /
COLOMBO, Valter 20019 Bresso (MI) / IT | 04 /
BRANCIAROLI, Osvaldo 10100 Torino / IT | [2021/42] | Representative(s) | Bottero, Carlo, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2021/42] | Marturano, Pasqualino, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 21168161.4 | 13.04.2021 | [2021/42] | Priority number, date | IT20200007867 | 14.04.2020 Original published format: IT202000007867 | [2021/42] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3895546 | Date: | 20.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A23L2/48, A23B5/01, A23C3/07, A23L3/005, A61L2/00, A61L12/06 | [2021/42] | CPC: |
A23L2/48 (EP);
A23B5/01 (EP);
A23C3/076 (EP);
A23L3/0055 (EP);
A61L2/0058 (EP);
A61L2202/121 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/18] |
Former [2021/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERMINDERUNG DER MIKROBIELLEN BELASTUNG EINER FLÜSSIGKEIT UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DESSELBEN | [2021/42] | English: | METHOD FOR REDUCING THE MICROBIAL LOAD OF A LIQUID AND RELATED APPARATUS FOR CARRYING IT OUT | [2021/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RÉDUCTION DE LA CHARGE MICROBIENNE D'UN LIQUIDE ET APPAREIL ASSOCIÉ POUR SA MISE EN OEUVRE | [2021/42] | Examination procedure | 30.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/18] | 30.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]CH563805 (STOUTZ WILLIAM PATRICK DE) [X] 1,3-7,12,14,15 * the whole document * [Y] 2,8,11 [I] 2,8-11,13; | [XYI]US3934042 (DE STOUTZ WILLIAM PATRICK) [X] 1,3,4,6,7,12,14,15 * column 1, line 46 - column 3, line 64; figures 1-6 * [Y] 2,8,11 [I] 2,5,8-11,13; | [Y]FR2539997 (GEERE INTERNATIONAL [FR]) [Y] 2,8,11 * the whole document *; | [A]RU2083140 (PALMOV FEDOR VLADIMIROVICH [RU]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]RU2415595 (OOO AGROTEHK [RU]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP2060186 | EP2594136 | EP3491933 |