EP3895524 - STUMP CUTTER DRIVE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.12.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.03.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.09.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vermeer Manufacturing Company 1210 Vermeer Road East Pella, IA 50219 / US | [2021/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pfoltner, Chris Knoxvolle, IA 50138 / US | 02 /
Alexander, David Indianola, IA 50125 / US | 03 /
Munk, Jesse Reasnor, IA 50232 / US | 04 /
Rempe, Scott Pella, IA 50219 / US | [2021/43] |
Former [2021/42] | 01 /
Pfoltner, Chris Knoxvolle, IA, 50138 / US | ||
02 /
Alexander, David Indianola, IA, 50125 / US | |||
03 /
Munk, Jesse Reasnor, IA, 50232 / US | |||
04 /
Rempe, Scott Pella, IA, 50219 / US | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2021/42] | Application number, filing date | 21168328.9 | 14.04.2021 | [2021/42] | Priority number, date | US202063010199P | 15.04.2020 Original published format: US 202063010199 P | US202063035215P | 05.06.2020 Original published format: US 202063035215 P | US202117226463 | 09.04.2021 Original published format: US202117226463 | [2021/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3895524 | Date: | 20.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3895524 | Date: | 05.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A01G23/06 | [2021/42] | CPC: |
A01G23/067 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/16] |
Former [2021/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ANTRIEBSSYSTEM FÜR STUMPFSCHNEIDER | [2021/42] | English: | STUMP CUTTER DRIVE SYSTEM | [2021/42] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE DE DESSOUCHEUSE | [2021/42] | Examination procedure | 11.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/16] | 11.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 05.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5657803 (KAPPEL GARY W [US], et al); | [YA]US2012144793 (CLARK STANLEY [US], et al); | [YD]US8783308 (KAPPEL GARY WAYNE [US], et al) | by applicant | US8783308 |