EP4074585 - A UTILITY VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.08.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.04.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2024 | New entry: Decision on request for further processing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Laplandar ApS Skovvej 9 2930 Klampenborg / DK | [2022/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kirsebom, Jochum, Trygve, Harald 2930 Klampenborg / DK | 02 /
Pedersen, Glenn 7100 Vejle / DK | 03 /
Dzafic, Adis 3700 Rønne / DK | [2022/42] | Representative(s) | Inspicos P/S Agern Allé 24 2970 Hørsholm / DK | [2022/42] | Application number, filing date | 21168573.0 | 15.04.2021 | [2022/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4074585 | Date: | 19.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B62K5/10, B62K7/04, B62K5/06, B62M6/60, B62M9/02, B62M6/50, // B62K15/00, B62J45/411 | [2022/42] | CPC: |
B62K7/04 (EP);
B62K5/06 (EP);
B62K5/10 (EP);
B62M6/50 (EP);
B62M6/60 (EP);
B62M9/02 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/21] |
Former [2022/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NUTZFAHRZEUG | [2022/42] | English: | A UTILITY VEHICLE | [2022/42] | French: | VÉHICULE UTILITAIRE | [2022/42] | Examination procedure | 18.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/21] | 19.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.03.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 15.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 15.04.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 15.04.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.04.2024 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH08142966 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1-3,5-12 * figures 1-8 * [A] 4,13,14; | [XA]KR20120040850 (KU SEONG DEUG [KR]) [X] 1-8 * figures 1-7 * [A] 9-14; | [XA]EP3205564 (WEBER HERBERT [DE]) [X] 1,2,13,14 * paragraphs [0052] - [0079] * * figures 1a-6c *[A] 3-12 |