EP3909830 - ENHANCED DRIVING CONTROL SYSTEM FOR SNOWMOBILES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.08.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.06.2023 [2023/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KA Group AG Europaallee 39 8004 Zurich / CH | [2021/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blackburn, Alexandre Notre-Dame-Du-Mont-Carmel, G0X 3J0 / CA | 02 /
St-Pierre, Luc Shawinigan, G9T 5K5 / CA | 03 /
Frigon, Alexandre St-Boniface, G0X 2L0 / CA | 04 /
Palardy, Alexandre Shawinigan, G9R 1G1 / CA | 05 /
Gagne, Francis Saint-Roch-de-Mékinac, G0X 2E0 / CA | [2021/46] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [2021/46] | Application number, filing date | 21168944.3 | 16.04.2021 | [2021/46] | Priority number, date | US202063012440P | 20.04.2020 Original published format: US 202063012440 P | [2021/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3909830 | Date: | 17.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B62D5/04 | [2021/46] | CPC: |
B62D5/04 (EP);
B62D55/07 (RU);
B62K21/12 (US);
B62B13/08 (US);
B62D5/0457 (EP);
B62D5/046 (US);
B62D5/0463 (EP);
B62D6/00 (US);
B62M27/02 (US);
B62M2027/026 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/51] |
Former [2021/46] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERTES FAHRSTEUERUNGSSYSTEM FÜR SCHNEEMOBILE | [2021/46] | English: | ENHANCED DRIVING CONTROL SYSTEM FOR SNOWMOBILES | [2021/46] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE DE CONDUITE AMÉLIORÉ POUR MOTONEIGES | [2021/46] | Examination procedure | 11.11.2021 | Examination requested [2021/51] | 11.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/23] | 19.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2023/23] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006191739 (KOGA SHINSUKE [JP]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0039]; figures 1-5 *; | [A]KR20080017846 (MANDO CORP [KR]) [A] 1-13* paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0052]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP3606802 (KONGSBERG INC [CA]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0024]; figures 1-4 * |