Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP4075228 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP4075228



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






All documents(55)
Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 206
05.02.2025 Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
05.02.2025 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
05.02.2025 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
05.02.2025 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
05.02.2025 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 18
05.02.2025 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 18
28.11.2024 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.11.2024 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
28.11.2024 Claims Search / examination 4
28.11.2024 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
28.11.2024 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
30.07.2024 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
30.07.2024 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
24.06.2024 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.06.2024 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
24.06.2024 Claims Search / examination 4
24.06.2024 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
24.06.2024 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
22.05.2024 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
16.05.2024 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
16.05.2024 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
16.05.2024 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
19.01.2024 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
19.01.2024 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
27.11.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.11.2023 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
27.11.2023 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 13
27.11.2023 Claims Search / examination 3
27.11.2023 Description Search / examination 11
27.11.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
27.11.2023 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
27.07.2023 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
27.07.2023 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
19.07.2023 Examination started Search / examination 1
18.04.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
18.04.2023 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
18.04.2023 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
18.04.2023 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 12
18.04.2023 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 12
18.04.2023 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
18.04.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
24.10.2022 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
21.09.2022 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
01.10.2021 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
01.10.2021 European search opinion Search / examination 4
01.10.2021 European search report Search / examination 2
01.10.2021 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
20.09.2021 Search started Search / examination 1
16.04.2021 Abstract Search / examination 1
16.04.2021 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
16.04.2021 Claims Search / examination 3
16.04.2021 Description Search / examination 12
16.04.2021 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
16.04.2021 Drawings Search / examination 3
16.04.2021 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5