EP4062814 - SHOWER SEAT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xiamen Aquasu Electric Shower Co., Ltd. No. 11 Haijing East 2nd Road China (Fujian) Free Trade Zone Haicang Xiamen City, Fujian / CN | [2022/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOU, Quanduo Haicang, Xiamen City / CN | 02 /
ZENG, Yan Haicang, Xiamen City / CN | [2023/18] |
Former [2022/39] | 01 /
HOU, Quanduo Haicang, Xiamen Cit / CN | ||
02 /
ZENG, Yan Haicang, Xiamen City / CN | Representative(s) | Chung, Hoi Kan Mandarin IP Limited 7 Cherry Trees Great Shelford Cambridge CB22 5XA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/39] | KIPA AB Drottninggatan 11 252 21 Helsingborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 21169267.8 | 19.04.2021 | [2022/39] | Priority number, date | CN202120613404U | 25.03.2021 Original published format: CN 202120613404 U | [2022/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4062814 | Date: | 28.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A47K3/28 | [2022/39] | CPC: |
A47K3/282 (EP);
A61G5/14 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/18] |
Former [2022/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DUSCHSITZ | [2022/39] | English: | SHOWER SEAT | [2022/39] | French: | SIÈGE DE DOUCHE | [2022/39] | Examination procedure | 28.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/18] | 28.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2024 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2018055231 (HAMID OMAR EMAD [US]) [Y] 1-5,8-10 * figures 5-7C *; | [A]CN111887753 (UNIV XI AN JIAOTONG) [A] 1-10* figures 1-16 *; | [Y]CN112089347 (XIAMEN AMASU ELECTRONIC SANITARY WARE CO LTD) [Y] 1-5,8-10 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0060]; figures 1-7 * |