Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2022219155 | Global Dossier | 20.10.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP21169356 | 20.04.2021 | EP21168727 | 15.04.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024189352 | Global Dossier | 13.06.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2022EP60118 | 14.04.2022 | EP21169356 | 20.04.2021 | EP21168727 | 15.04.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2024514608 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2022EP60118 | 14.04.2022 | EP21169356 | 20.04.2021 | EP21168727 | 15.04.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4323389 | Global Dossier | 21.02.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2022EP60118 | 14.04.2022 | EP21169356 | 20.04.2021 | EP21168727 | 15.04.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4079753 | Global Dossier | 26.10.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP21169356 | 20.04.2021 |